EP2723197 - MILK DRINK BASED ON OYSTER MUSHROOM LOVASTATIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Compagnie Des Brevets Nutraceutiques Rue Haute 30 1380 Lasne / BE | [2014/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOTTE, François Route d'Ottignies 86 B-1380 Lasne / BE | 02 /
WYVEKENS, Guy Rue Haute 30 B-1380 Lasne / BE | [2014/18] | Representative(s) | Coulon, Ludivine, et al Gevers Patents Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | [2014/18] | Application number, filing date | 12730521.7 | 27.06.2012 | [2015/50] | WO2012EP62411 | Priority number, date | BE20110000386 | 27.06.2011 Original published format: BE 201100386 | [2014/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013000934 | Date: | 03.01.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2723197 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2723197 | Date: | 09.12.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/30, A61K36/07, A23C9/152, A61K31/366 | [2014/18] | CPC: |
A61K31/366 (EP);
A23C9/13 (EP);
A23C9/152 (EP);
A23D7/0053 (EP);
A61K35/20 (EP);
A61K36/07 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MILCHGETRÄNK AUF DER BASIS VON AUSTERNPILZ-LOVASTATIN | [2014/18] | English: | MILK DRINK BASED ON OYSTER MUSHROOM LOVASTATIN | [2014/18] | French: | BOISSON LACTEE A BASE DE LOVASTATINE DE PLEUROTE | [2014/18] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/18] | 09.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.06.2012 | AL | 09.12.2015 | BG | 09.12.2015 | CY | 09.12.2015 | CZ | 09.12.2015 | DK | 09.12.2015 | EE | 09.12.2015 | FI | 09.12.2015 | HR | 09.12.2015 | LT | 09.12.2015 | LV | 09.12.2015 | MC | 09.12.2015 | MK | 09.12.2015 | MT | 09.12.2015 | PL | 09.12.2015 | RO | 09.12.2015 | RS | 09.12.2015 | SI | 09.12.2015 | SK | 09.12.2015 | SM | 09.12.2015 | TR | 09.12.2015 | NO | 09.03.2016 | GR | 10.03.2016 | IS | 09.04.2016 | BE | 30.06.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 27.06.2012 | |
BG | 09.12.2015 | ||
CY | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
HR | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
MK | 09.12.2015 | ||
MT | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
TR | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 27.06.2012 | |
CY | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
HR | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
MK | 09.12.2015 | ||
MT | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
TR | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
HR | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
MK | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 09.12.2015 | |
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 09.12.2015 | |
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 09.12.2015 | |
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | CZ | 09.12.2015 | |
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | CZ | 09.12.2015 | |
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 09.12.2015 | |
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 09.12.2015 | |
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/31] | FI | 09.12.2015 | |
IS | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | FI | 09.12.2015 | |
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 09.12.2015 | |
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | LT | 09.12.2015 | |
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 09.12.2015 | |
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 09.12.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]CN101755909 ; | [A]WO2006071085 (KOREA FOOD RES INST [KR], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 1, lines 6-9 * * page 3, lines 13-17 * * page 7, line 12 - page 8, line 3 * * page 11, lines 9-15 *; | [A]EP1908358 (EURO ALLIANZ PHARMA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0015] , [0017] , [0 21] , [0 23] * * claims 1,3,6-7 *; | [A]JP2008125500 (KUZUU MIKIO) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [0029] , [0050] *; | [A] - BOBEK P, OZDIN L, KUNIAK L, "Effect of oyster mushroom (Pleurotus ostreatus) and its ethanolic extract in diet on absorption and turnover of cholesterol in hypercholesterolemic rat", NAHRUNG, (1996), vol. 40, no. 4, pages 222 - 224, XP002666226 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/food.19960400413 | [A] - LI S ET AL, "preparation of flavored yogurt...", DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2010, no. 54, Database accession no. 2010-K00048, XP002666227 & CN101755909 A 20100630 (FRUIT TREE RES INST TIANJIN FOREST IND) [A] 1-11 * abstract * | [A] - ENDO A ET AL, "Dihydromonacolin L and monacolin X, new metabolites those inhibit cholesterol biosynthesis", JOURNAL OF ANTIBIOTICS, JAPAN ANTIBIOTICS RESEARCH ASSOCIATION, TOKYO, JP, (19850301), vol. 38, no. 3, ISSN 0021-8820, pages 321 - 327, XP008085631 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * |