EP2718625 - ILLUMINATING GLASS PARTITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAINT-GOBAIN GLASS FRANCE Tour Saint-Gobain 12 place de l'Iris 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2020/24] |
Former [2014/16] | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Glass France 18 avenue d' Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIERENS, Anne 12 rue d'Amiens F-60200 Compiegne / FR | 02 /
MONTGERMONT, Aude 13 rue du Rhin F-75019 Paris / FR | 03 /
ZHANG, Jingwei 38 rue des Ruelles F-91300 Massy / FR | [2014/30] |
Former [2014/16] | 01 /
GIERENS, Anne 12 rue d'Amiens F-60200 Compiegne / FR | ||
02 /
MONTGERMONT, Aude 12 rue de Châteaudun F-75009 Paris / FR | |||
03 /
ZHANG, Jingwei 38 rue des Ruelles F-91300 Massy / FR | Representative(s) | Saint-Gobain Recherche Département Propriété Industrielle 39 Quai Lucien Lefranc 93300 Aubervilliers / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | Ribeaudeau, Marion Christine, et al Saint-Gobain Recherche Département Propriété Industrielle 39 quai Lucien Lefranc 93300 Aubervilliers / FR | Application number, filing date | 12731540.6 | 07.06.2012 | WO2012FR51278 | Priority number, date | FR20110055062 | 09.06.2011 Original published format: FR 1155062 | [2014/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012168659 | Date: | 13.12.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2718625 | Date: | 16.04.2014 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F21V33/00, G02B6/00, E04B2/74, F21V3/00, F21V17/00 | [2014/16] | CPC: |
E04B2/745 (EP,US);
B32B17/10036 (EP);
B32B17/10541 (EP);
F21V33/006 (EP);
G02B6/0095 (EP);
F21Y2103/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/16] | Extension states | BA | 09.01.2014 | ME | 09.01.2014 | Title | German: | LEUCHTGLASTRENNWAND | [2014/16] | English: | ILLUMINATING GLASS PARTITION | [2014/16] | French: | CLOISON ECLAIRANTE EN VERRE | [2014/16] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/16] | 28.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/31] | 03.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.08.2015 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 01.02.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 01.02.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.02.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2019 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5786665 (OHTSUKI TERUKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 6* column 20, line 5 - line 34; figures 14-20 *; | [XI]WO02081844 (EMDE THOMAS [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,9,13,16 * page 11, line 4 - page 12, line 6; figures 1,2 * [I] 12; | [X]JP2007220352 (ARISTO ENGINEERING PTE LTD) [X] 1-4,10,13,16 * abstract *; | [XI]EP2317355 (MEITAKU INDUSTRY CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-6,9,16 * paragraphs [0019] - [0023]; figures 1-5 * [I] 7,8,11,14,15,17-19 |