EP2723405 - DEVICES FOR IMPROVED DELIVERY OF VOLATILE LIQUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/18] | DEVICES AND METHODS FOR IMPROVED DELIVERY OF VOLATILE LIQUIDS | ||
[2019/32] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reckitt & Colman (Overseas) Hygiene Home Limited 103-105 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 3UH / GB | [2019/19] |
Former [2014/18] | For all designated states Reckitt & Colman (Overseas) Limited 103-105 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 3UH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHNSON, Andrew Reckitt Benckiser Corporate Services Limited Dansom Lane Hull Yorkshire HU8 7DS / GB | 02 /
MAROUSE, Loic Reckitt Benckiser Corporate Services Limited Dansom Lane Hull Yorkshire HU8 7DS / GB | [2014/18] | Representative(s) | Carlin, Robert George, et al Reckitt Benckiser Corporate Services Limited Legal Department - Patents Group Dansom Lane Hull HU8 7DS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/18] | Carlin, Robert George, et al Reckitt Benckiser Corporate Services Limited Legal Department - Patents Group Dansom Lane Hull HU8 7DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 12731628.9 | 21.06.2012 | WO2012GB51441 | Priority number, date | GB20110010724 | 24.06.2011 Original published format: GB 201110724 | [2014/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012175971 | Date: | 27.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2723405 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61L9/14, A01M1/20, A61L9/12 | [2019/32] | CPC: |
A61L9/127 (EP,US);
A61L9/14 (EP,GB,US);
B05B7/2483 (US);
A01M1/2044 (EP,GB,US);
A01M1/205 (EP,US);
A61M11/02 (GB);
B01F23/2132 (US);
B01F23/21321 (US);
A61L2209/133 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/18] | A61L9/14, A61L9/12, A01M7/00, A01M11/00, B05B3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/18] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN FÜR DIE VERBESSERTE FREISETZUNG VON FLÜCHTIGEN FLÜSSIGKEITEN | [2019/32] | English: | DEVICES FOR IMPROVED DELIVERY OF VOLATILE LIQUIDS | [2019/32] | French: | DISPOSITIFS DE DIFFUSION AMÉLIORÉE DE LIQUIDES VOLATILS | [2019/32] |
Former [2014/18] | VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN FÜR DIE VERBESSERTE FREISETZUNG VON FLÜCHTIGEN FLÜSSIGKEITEN | ||
Former [2014/18] | DEVICES AND METHODS FOR IMPROVED DELIVERY OF VOLATILE LIQUIDS | ||
Former [2014/18] | DISPOSITIFS ET PROCÉDÉS DE DIFFUSION AMÉLIORÉE DE LIQUIDES VOLATILS | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/18] | 18.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 25.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.07.2017 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.12.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 21.12.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.01.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP0092359 (BOLTON TERENCE WILLIAM [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,5,9,10 * abstract * * pages 9-12, * * pages 14-19 * [I] 1-11; | [A]GB2233230 (SHIMIZU CONSTRUCTION CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11 * figure - *; | [A]WO9949904 (QUEST INT [NL], et al) [A] 1-11 * figure - *; | [AP]WO2011161462 (RECKITT & COLMAN OVERSEAS [GB], et al) [AP] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [AP]WO2012001405 (RECKITT & COLMAN OVERSEAS [GB], et al) [AP] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [AP]WO2012059771 (RECKITT & COLMAN OVERSEAS [GB], et al) [AP] 1-11* the whole document * |