EP2661670 - CONTEXTUAL USER INTERFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/46] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUDORF, Gregory David 10739 West Stallion Ranch Road Los Angeles California 91040 / US | 02 /
RUDMAN, Kenneth Alan 2040 La France Avenue South Pasadena California 91030 / US | 03 /
NADZAKOV, Vasil 8523 1/2 Saturn Street Los Angeles California 90035 / US | 04 /
YOON, Andrew 756 South Broadway Apt. 1108 Los Angeles California 90014 / US | 05 /
YEH, Roger 1201 Winston Avenue San Marino California 91108 / US | 06 /
BADAWIYEH, Basil 28623 Gabrial Place Santa Clarita California 91390 / US | 07 /
PINVIDIC, Genevieve Marie 250 S. San Fernando Blvd Burbank California 91502 / US | 08 /
FORTE, Dana Shawn 27829 Firebrand Drive Castaic California 91384 / US | 09 /
DIEP, Dan Han 6316 North Burton Avenue San Gabriel California 91775 / US | 10 /
AHMED, Samir M. 1324 Winchester Avenue Glendale California 91201 / US | 11 /
SHARTZER, Lee Douglas 25910 Matel Road Valencia California 91355 / US | 12 /
BISHOP, John Frederick 821 9th Street Apt. 8 Santa Monica California 90403 / US | 13 /
BOOTH JR., James Earl 1048 North Frederic Street Burban California 91505 / US | 14 /
TRAN, Hao Chi 11318 Bodger Street El Monte California 91732 / US | 15 /
LEE, Peter S. 23140 Park Marco Polo Calabasas Park California 91302 / US | 16 /
PICKERSGILL, Jason, Douglas 411 South Main St. 218 Los Angeles California 90013 / US | 17 /
WALKER, Mark, Leroy 30027 Cambridge Avenue Castaic California 91384 / US | 18 /
PETTIGREW, David 28 Green Street San Francisco California 94133 / US | [2013/46] | Representative(s) | Huchet, Anne, et al TECHNICOLOR 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/11] | Huchet, Anne, et al TECHNICOLOR European Patent Operations 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2013/46] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte, et al Technicolor European Patent Operations 1-5 Rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 12732133.9 | 04.01.2012 | WO2012US20124 | Priority number, date | US201161429732P | 04.01.2011 Original published format: US 201161429732 P | [2013/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012094356 | Date: | 12.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2661670 | Date: | 13.11.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.07.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/048, G06F3/0488, H04N21/431, H04N21/472, H04N21/41, H04N21/422 | [2014/26] | CPC: |
H04N21/42224 (EP,US);
G06F3/048 (KR);
H04N21/41265 (EP,US);
G06F3/0488 (EP,US);
H04N21/2665 (US);
H04N21/431 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/46] | G06F3/041 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/46] | Title | German: | KONTEXTBEZOGENE BENUTZEROBERFLÄCHE | [2013/46] | English: | CONTEXTUAL USER INTERFACE | [2013/46] | French: | INTERFACE UTILISATEUR CONTEXTUELLE | [2013/46] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2013 | Search fee paid | 25.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/46] | 23.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/09] | 28.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.05.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2010027974 (ANSARI JUNED [US]) [X] 1,3-5,7,9,11-13 * figure 7 * * paragraphs [0016] , [0 17] , [0 19] , [0 22] , [0 26] , [0 38] - [0039] * [Y] 2,8,10,15 [I] 6,14; | [Y]US2006053384 (LA FETRA FRANK E JR [US], et al) [Y] 2,8,10,15 * paragraphs [0033] , [0 37]; figure 6 *; | [A]US7409405 (MASINTER LARRY [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 6, line 11 - line 53 * * column 8, line 6 - column 9, line 6 * * column 10, line 8 - line 12 * | [Y] - Anonymous, "File association", (20100407), pages 1 - 3, Wikipedia, URL: http://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=File_association&oldid=354558456, (20140515), XP002724521 [Y] 1-5,9-13 * the whole document * | [Y] - Anonymous, "Microsoft Windows Media Player", (20101210), Wikipedia, URL: http://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Windows_Media_Player&oldid=401609646, (20140516), XP002724522 [Y] 1-5,9-13 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US2008303794 (BOLT STEPHEN [CA], et al); | [Y]US2010262928 (ABBOTT MARTIN JEFFREY [US]); | [A]US2010027974 (ANSARI JUNED [US]); | [A]US2010328224 (KERR DUNCAN [US], et al); | [A]US7461343 (KATES LAWRENCE [US]); | [A]US2005097478 (KILLIAN DAVID [US], et al) | by applicant | US2010027974 | US2006053384 |