Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9108567 | Global Dossier | 18.08.2015 | B2 | US2014333201 | 13.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012EP62797 | 02.07.2012 | DE102011081432 | 23.08.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103874604B | Global Dossier | 12.06.2018 | B | CN103874604 | 18.06.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012EP62797 | 02.07.2012 | DE102011081432 | 23.08.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2748035 | Global Dossier | 19.05.2021 | B1 | EP2748035 | 02.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012EP62797 | 02.07.2012 | DE102011081432 | 23.08.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013026601 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102011081432 | 23.08.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102011081432 | 28.02.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102011081432 | 23.08.2011 |