EP2734653 - BINDER COMPOSITION FOR AGGLOMERATION OF FINE MINERALS AND PELLETIZING PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 18.01.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant International Ltd Rothausstrasse 61 4132 Muttenz / CH | For all designated states Clariant S.A. Av. das Nacões Unidas, nº 18001 Santa Amaro 04795-100 São Paulo, SP / BR | [2016/40] |
Former [2015/37] | For all designated states CLARIANT INTERNATIONAL LTD Rothausstrasse 61 4132 Muttenz / CH | ||
For all designated states Clariant S.A. Av. das Nacões Unidas, nº 18001 Santa Amaro 04795-100 São Paulo, SP / BR | |||
Former [2014/22] | For all designated states Clariant Finance (BVI) Limited Citco Building Wickhams Cay P.O. Box 662 Road Town, Tortola / VG | ||
For all designated states Clariant S.A. Av. das Nacões Unidas, nº 18001 Santa Amaro 04795-100 São Paulo, SP / BR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DILSKY, Stefan Eichendorffstrasse 7 97218 Gerbrunn / DE | 02 /
TOOGE, Carlos, Augusto, Blasques Rua da Constituinte 57 ap. 21 04204-030 Sao Paulo / BR | 03 /
ARIAS MEDINA, Jorge, Antonio Rua Professor Alexandre Correia 620 ap. 21 05657-230 Sao Paulo / BR | 04 /
BARTALINI, Nilson, Mar Rua Teodoro de Beaurepaire 208 ap. 53 Ipiranga 04279-030 Sao Paulo / BR | 05 /
SANTOS, Almir, T. Avenida Pedro Lessa 2110 Bairro: Embare 11025-002 Santos / BR | 06 /
DA SILVA, Wagner, Claudio Rua Nelson Gama de Oliveira 550 42 A Morumbi CEP 05734-150 Sao Paulo - SP / BR | 07 /
SPECK CASSOLA, Monica Rua Jose Vidal Franca 40 casa 03 04741-100 Sao Paulo / BR | [2014/22] | Representative(s) | Mikulecky, Klaus, et al Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Patent & License Management Chemicals Industriepark Höchst, G 860 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2014/22] | Application number, filing date | 12732981.1 | 03.07.2012 | [2015/50] | WO2012EP02785 | Priority number, date | EP20110005970 | 21.07.2011 Original published format: EP 11005970 | [2014/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013010629 | Date: | 24.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2734653 | Date: | 28.05.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2734653 | Date: | 09.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/50] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2734653 | Date: | 20.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C22B1/242, C22B1/243, C22B1/244 | [2014/22] | CPC: |
C22B1/243 (EP,RU,US);
C22B1/242 (RU);
C22B1/244 (RU,US);
Y02P10/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FI, IT, SE [2015/42] |
Former [2014/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BINDEMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR AGGLOMERATION VON FEINMINERALIEN UND PELLETIERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2014/22] | English: | BINDER COMPOSITION FOR AGGLOMERATION OF FINE MINERALS AND PELLETIZING PROCESS | [2014/22] | French: | COMPOSITION DE LIANT POUR AGGLOMÉRATION DE MATIÈRES MINÉRALES FINES ET PROCÉDÉ DE PASTILLAGE | [2014/22] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/22] | 10.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.09.2016
13.09.2016
ADMISSIBLE BASF SE Global Intellectual Property GVX-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE Opponent's representative BASF IP Association BASF SE G-FLP-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.09.2016
13.09.2016
ADMISSIBLE BASF SE Global Intellectual Property GVX-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE Opponent's representative BASF IP Association BASF SE ZRX-C6 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 18.10.2016 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.02.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 08.02.2018 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 08.02.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.05.2018 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.05.2018 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 12.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 26.10.2018 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 01.02.2017 | FI | 03.07.2017 | IT | 03.07.2017 | ES | 04.07.2017 | [2019/13] |
Former [2018/41] | DE | 01.02.2017 | |
FI | 03.07.2017 | ||
IT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/22] | DE | 01.02.2017 | |
FI | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | DE | 01.02.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS5950129 (NIPPON STEEL CORP, et al) [A] 1-23 * abstract *; | [XA]WO9116463 (ALLIED COLLOIDS LTD [GB]) [X] 1-4 * claims 1-10 * * page 2, lines 31-32 * [A] 5-23; | [AD]US2002035188 (STEEGHS HENRICUS RENIER GERARD [US], et al) [AD] 1-23 * paragraphs [0015] , [0016] , [0026] *; | [XA]US6384126 (PIRTLE JAMES [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [Summary_of_the_invention] * [A] 5-23; | [AD]EP1367141 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP], et al) [AD] 1-23 * claims 1-29 *; | [A]EP1541700 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-23 * paragraph [0012]; claims 8,9 ** paragraphs [0030] , [0031] , [0037] * | by applicant | US4684549 | US4728537 | US4767449 | US5294250 | US5306327 | US5698007 | US2002035188 | EP1367141 | - ZHOU Y.; HU Y.; WANG Y., "Effect of metallic ions on dispersibility of fine diaspora", TRANSACTIONS OF NONFERROUS METALS SOCIETY OF CHINA, (2011), vol. 21, pages 1166 - 1171 | - MARISA M.; LAURINDO S.L.F., "Influence of pump aggregation state at flotation of quartz, apatite and calcite", JORNAL ESCOLA DE MINAS, (2006), vol. 56, pages 55 - 60 | Opposition | US2775566 | US3644113 | CA902435 | US3860414 | JPS5950129 | EP0225171 | US4728537 | US4767449 | EP0288150 | US4802914 | EP0376713 | EP0413603 | EP0413592 | WO9116463 | US6113844 | US2002035188 | US6384126 | US2003004246 | EP1367141 | EP1462507 | EP1541700 | WO2007069857 | CN101157985 | US2014243552 | - T.C. EISELE et al., "A review of binders in iron ore pelletization", Mineral Processing and Extractive Metallurgy Review, (20030000), vol. 24, pages 1 - 90, XP009033605 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/08827500306896 | - R. SAH et al., "Effects of Binder on the Properties of Iron Ore-Coal Composite Pellets", Mineral Processing and Extractive Matallurgy Review, (20100122), vol. 31, no. 2, pages 73 - 85, XP055196849 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/08827500903404732 | - HAYDN H. MURRAY, "Overview - clay mineral applications", Applied Clay Science, (19910300), vol. 5, no. 5-6, pages 379 - 395, XP055305677 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0169-1317(91)90014-Z | - MURRAY, HAYDN H, "OVERVIEW CLAY MINERAL APPLICATIONS", APPLIED CLAY SCIENCE, vol. 5, no. 5-6, pages 379 - 395, XP055305677 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0169-1317(91)90014-Z |