Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
12.08.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.09.2016 [2016/37] |
08.04.2016 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
03.07.2015 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
29.08.2014 | Change - extension states | published on 01.10.2014 [2014/40] |
03.04.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
28.03.2014 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 30.04.2014 [2014/18] |
28.03.2014 | Request for examination filed | published on 30.04.2014 [2014/18] |
31.01.2014 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
12.11.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
25.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant | |
19.10.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
15.01.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
28.12.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
17.07.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication |