EP2729047 - FLAT MOP AND SUPPORT PLATE THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.2016 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Freudenberg KG Höhnerweg 2-4 69469 Weinheim / DE | [2014/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINDNER, Falk Königsberger Strasse 87 69502 Hemsbach / DE | 02 /
EISENHUT, Andreas Leonie-Wild-Weg 16 69181 Leimen / DE | 03 /
LINDHOLM, Keijo Mahlarinne 4 FIN-24280 Salo / FI | 04 /
DEERBERG, Jens Emmastrasse 70a 45130 Essen / DE | 05 /
GRATZKI, Torsten Thiemannstr. 19 45219 Essen / DE | [2014/20] | Application number, filing date | 12733407.6 | 05.06.2012 | WO2012EP02387 | Priority number, date | DE201110107319 | 06.07.2011 Original published format: DE102011107319 | [2014/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013004326 | Date: | 10.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2729047 | Date: | 14.05.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A47L13/258 | [2014/20] | CPC: |
A47L13/256 (EP,US);
A47L13/258 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/20] | Title | German: | FLACHWISCHER UND TRÄGERPLATTE DAFÜR | [2014/20] | English: | FLAT MOP AND SUPPORT PLATE THEREFOR | [2014/20] | French: | BALAI DE LAVAGE À PLAT ET PLAQUE DE SUPPORT POUR CELUI | [2015/34] |
Former [2014/20] | BALAI DE LAVAGE À PLAT ET PLAQUE DE SUPPORT ASSOCIÉE | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2013 | Examination requested [2014/20] | 18.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/22] | 27.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.08.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3457581 (OAS DAVID B) [A] 1,14 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0126054 (HEINONEN AHTI) [A] 1 * page 4, line 9 - line 32; figure - *; | [A]EP1527728 (FREUDENBERG CARL KG [DE]) [A] 1* figure - *; | [XP]WO2011085769 (FREUDENBERG CARL KG [DE], et al) [XP] 1-7,11-13,16,18,21,25 * page 7, line 6 - page 8, line 10; figures 1,2 * |