blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2664654

EP2664654 - THERMOSETTING-RESIN-CONTAINING LIQUID HAVING DISPERSED FINE CARBON FIBERS, AND MOLDED THERMOSET RESIN OBTAINED THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  13.06.2014
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip13.06.2014Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 16.07.2014  [2014/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hodogaya Chemical Co., Ltd.
2-4-1, Yaesu, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-0028 / JP
[2013/47]
Inventor(s)01 / TARUMOTO, Naohiro
c/o Hodogaya Chemical Co., Ltd.
2-4-1, Yaesu, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-0028 / JP
02 / TSUKADA, Takayuki
c/o Hodogaya Chemical Co., Ltd.
2-4-1, Yaesu, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-0028 / JP
03 / URAGAMI, Tatsumi
c/o Hodogaya Chemical Co., Ltd.
2-4-1, Yaesu, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-0028 / JP
 [2013/47]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/47]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date12733870.511.01.2012
WO2012JP50405
Priority number, dateJP2011000405912.01.2011         Original published format: JP 2011004059
[2013/47]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2012096317
Date:19.07.2012
Language:JA
[2012/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2664654
Date:20.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP19.07.2012
ClassificationIPC:C08L101/00, C08J5/24, C08K3/04, C08K7/06, C08L29/14
[2013/47]
CPC:
B82Y30/00 (EP,KR,US); C08K7/06 (EP,KR,US); C08K5/1575 (KR,US);
B05D3/0254 (KR,US); C03C25/47 (EP,KR,US); C08J5/005 (EP,KR,US);
C08J5/042 (EP,KR,US); C08J5/24 (KR); C08K3/04 (EP,KR,US);
C08L101/00 (KR); C08L29/14 (KR); D06M11/74 (US);
C08J2300/00 (KR); C08J2300/24 (EP,US); C08J2329/14 (KR);
Y10T442/20 (EP,US); Y10T442/2426 (EP,US); Y10T442/2902 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2984 (EP,US); Y10T442/2992 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/47]
TitleGerman:WÄRMEHÄRTENDE HARZHALTIGE FLÜSSIGKEIT MIT DISPERGIERTEN FEINEN KOHLENSTOFFFASERN UND DARAUS GEFORMTES WÄRMEHÄRTBARES HARZ[2013/47]
English:THERMOSETTING-RESIN-CONTAINING LIQUID HAVING DISPERSED FINE CARBON FIBERS, AND MOLDED THERMOSET RESIN OBTAINED THEREFROM[2013/47]
French:LIQUIDE CONTENANT UNE RÉSINE THERMODURCISSABLE CONTENANT DES FIBRES DE CARBONE FINES DISPERSÉES, ET RÉSINE THERMODURCIE MOULÉE OBTENUE À PARTIR DE CELUI-CI[2013/47]
Entry into regional phase10.07.2013Translation filed 
11.07.2013National basic fee paid 
11.07.2013Search fee paid 
11.07.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
11.07.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.07.2013Examination requested  [2013/47]
26.11.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.06.2014Application withdrawn by applicant  [2014/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[Y]JP2002060639  (SHOWA DENKO KK);
 [Y]JP2008511741  (HYPERION CATALYSIS INTERNATIONAL INC.);
 [X]JP2010045025  (HODOGAYA CHEMICAL CO LTD)
by applicantJP2004202004
 JP2004202001
 JP2005109870
 JP2005162877
 JP3720044B
 JP2006028313
 JP2006063436
 JP3761561B
 JP3776111B
 WO2007004652
 JP2007039623
 JP2008248412
 WO2010041750
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.