EP2664004 - PHOTOVOLTAIC CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.07.2015 [2015/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nusola, Inc. 1133 Douglas Avenue Suite 301 Burlingame, CA 94010 / US | [2013/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRICENO, José Yukigaya Terrace 101 Higashi Yukigaya 3-10-10 Ohta-Ku Tokyo / JP | [2013/47] | Representative(s) | EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/47] | EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London Greater London WC1V 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 12734230.1 | 11.01.2012 | WO2012US20981 | Priority number, date | US201161433185P | 14.01.2011 Original published format: US 201161433185 P | [2013/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012097090 | Date: | 19.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2664004 | Date: | 20.11.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.07.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/0352 | [2013/47] | CPC: |
H01L31/07 (EP,CN,US);
Y02E10/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/47] | Title | German: | PHOTOVOLTAISCHE ZELLEN | [2013/47] | English: | PHOTOVOLTAIC CELLS | [2013/47] | French: | CELLULES PHOTOVOLTAÏQUES | [2013/47] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2013 | Search fee paid | 14.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/47] | 06.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/27] | 11.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2109147 (FOM INST FOR ATOMIC AND MOLUEC [NL]) [X] 1-7,10-15 * paragraphs [0009] - [0031] - [0054]; figure 5 *; | [X]WO2010088726 (UNIV SOUTH AUSTRALIA [AU], et al) [X] 1-4,8,9* pages 1,4,9,12; figure 1 * | International search | [A]US2007163638 (VAN DUREN JEROEN K J [US], et al); | [Y]US2009217973 (ALIVISATOS PAUL A [US], et al); | [Y]US2010000598 (LORENZETTI CESARE [IT], et al); | [Y]US2010313951 (NALAMASU OMKARAM [US], et al) |