Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9933434 | ![]() | 03.04.2018 | B2 | US2017248585 | 31.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615346967 | 09.11.2016 | US201514846400 | 04.09.2015 | US201161433043 | 14.01.2011 | US201313997934 | 27.06.2013 | WO2012US21339 | 13.01.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9523695 | ![]() | 20.12.2016 | B2 | US2016097776 | 07.04.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514846400 | 04.09.2015 | US201161433043 | 14.01.2011 | US201313997934 | 27.06.2013 | WO2012US21339 | 13.01.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9217040 | ![]() | 22.12.2015 | B2 | US2013273073 | 17.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213997934 | 13.01.2012 | US201161433043 | 14.01.2011 | WO2012US21339 | 13.01.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12222355 | ![]() | 11.02.2025 | B2 | US2023341412 | 26.10.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615346967 | 09.11.2016 | US201514846400 | 04.09.2015 | US201161433043 | 14.01.2011 | US201313997934 | 27.06.2013 | WO2012US21339 | 13.01.2012 | US202218058239 | 22.11.2022 | US201815894741 | 12.02.2018 | US202017130928 | 22.12.2020 | US202016777738 | 30.01.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11536727 | ![]() | 27.12.2022 | B2 | US2021208158 | 08.07.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615346967 | 09.11.2016 | US201514846400 | 04.09.2015 | US201161433043 | 14.01.2011 | US201313997934 | 27.06.2013 | WO2012US21339 | 13.01.2012 | US201815894741 | 12.02.2018 | US202017130928 | 22.12.2020 | US202016777738 | 30.01.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10900973 | ![]() | 26.01.2021 | B2 | US2020309785 | 01.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615346967 | 09.11.2016 | US201514846400 | 04.09.2015 | US201161433043 | 14.01.2011 | US201313997934 | 27.06.2013 | WO2012US21339 | 13.01.2012 | US201815894741 | 12.02.2018 | US202016777738 | 30.01.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10627409 | ![]() | 21.04.2020 | B2 | US2018348232 | 06.12.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615346967 | 09.11.2016 | US201514846400 | 04.09.2015 | US201161433043 | 14.01.2011 | US201313997934 | 27.06.2013 | WO2012US21339 | 13.01.2012 | US201815894741 | 12.02.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3885366 | ![]() | 29.12.2021 | A3 | EP3885366 | 29.09.2021 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201161433043 | 14.01.2011 | EP12734733 | 13.01.2012 | WO2012US21339 | 13.01.2012 | EP17167174 | 13.01.2012 | EP19192973 | 13.01.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3604339 | ![]() | 10.03.2021 | B1 | EP3604339 | 05.02.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161433043 | 14.01.2011 | EP12734733 | 13.01.2012 | WO2012US21339 | 13.01.2012 | EP17167174 | 13.01.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3252076 | ![]() | 04.09.2019 | B1 | EP3252076 | 06.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161433043 | 14.01.2011 | EP12734733 | 13.01.2012 | WO2012US21339 | 13.01.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2981662 | ![]() | 05.02.2019 | C | CA2981662 | 19.07.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161433043 | 14.01.2011 | CA2858350 | 13.01.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2663579 | ![]() | 26.04.2017 | B1 | EP2663579 | 17.09.2014 | A4 | EP2663579 | 20.11.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201161433043 | 14.01.2011 | WO2012US21339 | 13.01.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2858350 | 19.07.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161433043 | 14.01.2011 | WO2012US21339 | 13.01.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3027071 | 19.07.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2981662 | 13.01.2012 | US201161433043 | 14.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2663579T | 31.07.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201161433043 | 14.01.2011 | WO2012US21339 | 13.01.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3252076T | 02.12.2019 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201161433043 | 14.01.2011 | EP12734733 | 13.01.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3604339T | 12.04.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201161433043 | 14.01.2011 | EP17167174 | 13.01.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2634098T | 26.09.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201161433043 | 14.01.2011 | WO2012US21339 | 13.01.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3604339T | 27.12.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201161433043 | 14.01.2011 | EP12734733 | 13.01.2012 | WO2012US21339 | 13.01.2012 | EP17167174 | 13.01.2012 | EP19192973 | 13.01.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012097313 | ![]() | 10.01.2013 | A3 | WO2012097313 | 19.07.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201161433043 | 14.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2758533T | 05.05.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201161433043 | 14.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2865068T | 14.10.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201161433043 | 14.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE035281T | 02.05.2018 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US201161433043 | 14.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE053720T | 28.07.2021 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US201161433043 | 14.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2663579T | 29.09.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201161433043 | 14.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2663579T | 28.07.2017 | T | Priority number | Date | US201161433043 | 14.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT3604339T | 13.04.2021 | T | Priority number | Date | US201161433043 | 14.01.2011 | Type | ![]() | EP3252076 | EP3604339 |