EP2729725 - SURFACE COATINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.07.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BP Exploration Operating Company Limited Chertsey Road Sunbury on Thames, Middlesex TW16 7BP / GB | [2014/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Anthony, David Whitchurch Hill Pangbourne Reading Berkshire RG8 7QR / GB | 02 /
WEST, Kevin, Richard Whitchurch Hill Pangbourne Reading Berkshire RG8 7QR / GB | [2014/20] | Representative(s) | Wilson, Nicola Ann BP International Limited Global Patents & Technology Law Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames, Middx TW16 7LN / GB | [2014/20] | Application number, filing date | 12734915.7 | 06.07.2012 | WO2012EP63232 | Priority number, date | US201161505235P | 07.07.2011 Original published format: US 201161505235 P | [2014/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013004811 | Date: | 10.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2729725 | Date: | 14.05.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F16L58/04, F17D1/16 | [2014/20] | CPC: |
F16L58/04 (EP,US);
C09D5/1625 (US);
F17D1/16 (EP,US);
F17D3/08 (EP);
Y10T428/31504 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31678 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/20] | Title | German: | OBERFLÄCHENBESCHICHTUNGEN | [2014/20] | English: | SURFACE COATINGS | [2014/20] | French: | REVÊTEMENTS DE SURFACE | [2014/20] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/20] | 18.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/36] | 10.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.10.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]WO2009145627 (TWISTER BV [NL], et al) [YD] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [AD]WO2010080946 (SHELL OIL CO [US], et al) [AD] 1-13* the whole document *; | [Y]WO2010101477 (M I SWACO NORGE AS [NO], et al) [Y] 1-13 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 8, line 19 - line 20 * * page 9, line 15 - page 10, line 14 * | by applicant | US2008176778 | US2009152502 | WO2009145627 | WO2010080946 |