EP2727052 - PORTABLE DEVICE WITH APERTURED ELECTRICAL CONTACTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.05.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, CH | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thales Dis France SAS 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [2022/25] |
Former [2019/36] | For all designated states Thales Dis France SA 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | ||
Former [2014/19] | For all designated states Gemalto SA 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MERLIN, Lionel 218 chemin des Lilas F-13119 Saint Savournin / FR | 02 /
LAHOUI, Nizar 34A - Résidence Jardin des Potiers F-13400 Aubagne / FR | 03 /
BUYUKKALENDER, Arek 15 rue Paul Prebois F-13013 Marseille / FR | 04 /
DOSSETTO, Lucile 86 Chemin du Baou F-83270 Saint Cyr Sur Mer / FR | 05 /
ROBERTET, Laurence 5 Lot. Lei Piblo F-13420 Gemenos / FR | 06 /
BRONDINO, Catherine 9 rue des Camelias F-13120 Biver / FR | 07 /
SEBAN, Frédérick Bastide de l'Olivaie CD1 - Le Gibal F-13260 Cassis / FR | [2014/19] | Representative(s) | Milharo, Emilien, et al Thales Dis France SAS Intellectual Property Department Avenue du Jujubier BP 90, Z.I. Athélia IV 13705 La Ciotat / FR | [2022/52] | Application number, filing date | 12735234.2 | 22.06.2012 | [2022/52] | WO2012EP62153 | Priority number, date | EP20110305857 | 01.07.2011 Original published format: EP 11305857 | [2014/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013004522 | Date: | 10.01.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2727052 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2727052 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077 | [2014/19] | CPC: |
G06K19/077 (EP,KR,US);
H01Q1/22 (US);
G06K19/07749 (EP,US);
G06Q20/10 (US);
G06Q20/105 (US);
H01L2224/45147 (US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48227 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48228 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/45147, H01L2924/00 (US);
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRAGBARES GERÄT MIT GELOCHTEN ELEKTRISCHEN KONTAKTEN | [2022/19] | English: | PORTABLE DEVICE WITH APERTURED ELECTRICAL CONTACTS | [2014/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF PORTABLE AVEC DES CONTACTS ÉLECTRIQUES AJOURÉS | [2022/19] |
Former [2014/19] | TRAGBARE VORRICHTUNG MIT ELEKTRISCHEN KONTAKTEN MIT EINER APERTUR | ||
Former [2014/19] | DISPOSITIF PORTATIF A CONTACTS ELECTRIQUES EVIDES | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/19] | 14.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.11.2018 | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 28.12.2022 | AT | 28.12.2022 | CZ | 28.12.2022 | DK | 28.12.2022 | EE | 28.12.2022 | FI | 28.12.2022 | HR | 28.12.2022 | LT | 28.12.2022 | LV | 28.12.2022 | MC | 28.12.2022 | NL | 28.12.2022 | PL | 28.12.2022 | RO | 28.12.2022 | RS | 28.12.2022 | SE | 28.12.2022 | SI | 28.12.2022 | SK | 28.12.2022 | SM | 28.12.2022 | NO | 28.03.2023 | GR | 29.03.2023 | IS | 28.04.2023 | PT | 28.04.2023 | IE | 22.06.2023 | LU | 22.06.2023 | BE | 30.06.2023 | CH | 30.06.2023 | [2024/24] |
Former [2024/21] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
DK | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
MC | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SI | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
IE | 22.06.2023 | ||
LU | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/15] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
DK | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
MC | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SI | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
LU | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
DK | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
MC | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SI | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
DK | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
MC | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
DK | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 28.12.2022 | |
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | EE | 28.12.2022 | |
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/27] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/24] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 28.12.2022 | |
NO | 28.03.2023 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2009271972 (CARUANA JEAN-PAUL [FR], et al) | Examination | FR2797976 | by applicant | FR2765010 | EP1492148 | EP1031939 | EP1932104 | US2009271972 |