EP2729462 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING TETRAZOLE SUBSTITUTED ANTHRANILIC ACID DERIVATIVES BY CONVERTING PYRAZOLE ACIDS WITH ANTHRANILIC ACID ESTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/20] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING TETRAZOLE-SUBSTITUTED ANTHRANILIC ACID DIAMIDE DERIVATIVES BY REACTING PYRAZOLIC ACIDS WITH ANTHRANILIC ACID ESTERS | ||
[2017/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.06.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer CropScience Aktiengesellschaft Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim / DE | [2018/31] |
Former [2014/20] | For all designated states Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10 40789 Monheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAZENOK, Sergii Wipperauer Str. 57 42699 Solingen / DE | 02 /
VOLZ, Frank Helmholtzstr. 69 (rechts) 50825 Köln / DE | 03 /
LUI, Norbert Am Geus Garten 2 51519 Odenthal / DE | 04 /
NEEFF, Arnd Bornheim 19a 51399 Burscheid / DE | 05 /
SZYWALSKI, Sylvia Theodorstr. 8 51377 Leverkusen / DE | [2014/20] | Representative(s) | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/40] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2014/20] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 12735264.9 | 05.07.2012 | [2017/40] | WO2012EP63169 | Priority number, date | EP20110173325 | 08.07.2011 Original published format: EP 11173325 | US201161506265P | 11.07.2011 Original published format: US 201161506265 P | [2014/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013007604 | Date: | 17.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2729462 | Date: | 14.05.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2729462 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/14, A01N43/713 | [2014/20] | CPC: |
C07D401/14 (EP,CN,US);
A01N43/713 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON TETRAZOL-SUBSTITUIERTEN ANTHRANILSÄUREDIAMID-DERIVATEN DURCH UMSETZUNG VON PYRAZOLSÄUREN MIT ANTHRANILSÄUREESTERN | [2014/20] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING TETRAZOLE SUBSTITUTED ANTHRANILIC ACID DERIVATIVES BY CONVERTING PYRAZOLE ACIDS WITH ANTHRANILIC ACID ESTERS | [2017/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION DE DÉRIVÉS DE DIAMIDE D'ACIDE ANTHRANILIQUE SUBSTITUÉS PAR TÉTRAZOL, PAR RÉACTION DE L'ACIDE PYRAZOLIQUE AVEC DES ESTERS D'ACIDE ANTHRANILIQUE | [2017/28] |
Former [2014/20] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING TETRAZOLE-SUBSTITUTED ANTHRANILIC ACID DIAMIDE DERIVATIVES BY REACTING PYRAZOLIC ACIDS WITH ANTHRANILIC ACID ESTERS | ||
Former [2014/20] | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE DÉRIVÉS DE DIAMIDE D'ACIDE ANTHRANILIQUE SUBSTITUÉS PAR TÉTRAZOLE PAR MISE EN RÉACTION D'ACIDES PYRAZOLIQUES AVEC DES ESTERS D'ACIDE ANTHRANILIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/20] | 02.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.07.2012 | AL | 04.10.2017 | CY | 04.10.2017 | CZ | 04.10.2017 | EE | 04.10.2017 | HR | 04.10.2017 | LT | 04.10.2017 | LV | 04.10.2017 | MC | 04.10.2017 | MK | 04.10.2017 | MT | 04.10.2017 | PL | 04.10.2017 | PT | 04.10.2017 | RO | 04.10.2017 | RS | 04.10.2017 | SE | 04.10.2017 | SI | 04.10.2017 | SK | 04.10.2017 | SM | 04.10.2017 | TR | 04.10.2017 | BG | 04.01.2018 | NO | 04.01.2018 | GR | 05.01.2018 | IS | 04.02.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 05.07.2012 | |
CY | 04.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MK | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PT | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
TR | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 05.07.2012 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PT | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
TR | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CZ | 04.10.2017 | |
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
TR | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | CZ | 04.10.2017 | |
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 04.10.2017 | |
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 04.10.2017 | |
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CZ | 04.10.2017 | |
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CZ | 04.10.2017 | |
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | HR | 04.10.2017 | |
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | LT | 04.10.2017 | |
NO | 04.01.2018 | Cited in | International search | [ID]WO2010069502 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [ID] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [AP]WO2011098408 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [AP] 1-8 * examples 1-6; claim 4 * | by applicant | WO2010069502 | WO2008070158 | WO2007144100 | WO2011073101 | WO2004020445 | - WILLIAM P. NORRIS, J. ORG. CHEM., (1962), vol. 27, no. 9, pages 3248 - 3251 | - HENRY C. BROWN; ROBERT J. KASSAL, J. ORG. CHEM., (1967), vol. 32, no. 6, pages 1871 - 1873 | - DENNIS P. CURRAN; SABINE HADIDA; SUN-YOUNG KIM, TETRAHEDRON, (1999), vol. 55, no. 29, pages 8997 - 9006 | - L.D. HANSEN; E.J. BACA; P. SCHEINER, JOURNAL OF HETEROCYCLIC CHEMISTRY, (1970), vol. 7, pages 991 - 996 | - JACS, vol. 27, page 3248 |