Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2734141 | Global Dossier | 31.08.2016 | B1 | EP2734141 | 28.05.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012EP64014 | 17.07.2012 | DE102011107637 | 18.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2616828T | 14.06.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2012EP64014 | 17.07.2012 | DE102011107637 | 18.07.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013011029 | Global Dossier | 24.01.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102011107637 | 18.07.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102011107637 | 24.01.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102011107637 | 18.07.2011 |