EP2723794 - COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING EPOXY RESINS AND A MIXTURE OF A POLYAMINE AND SUBSTITUTED PHENOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/18] | NOVEL POLYMERS AND POLYMER COMPOSITIONS | ||
[2018/15] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.09.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Holland Novochem Technical Coatings B.V. Villawal 15 3432 NX Nieuwegein / NL | [2014/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASLOW, Alexander Bagijnenstraat 23 NL-7411 PT Deventer / NL | 02 /
SCHOOLEN, Alexander Tingietersdonk 435 NL-7326 NW Apeldoorn / NL | 03 /
BIJPOST, Erik, Alexander Donkeregaarde 45 NL-3436 ZD Nieuwegein / NL | [2014/18] | Representative(s) | Griebling, Onno Octrooibureau Griebling BV Sportweg 10 5037 AC Tilburg / NL | [2014/18] | Application number, filing date | 12735662.4 | 25.06.2012 | WO2012NL00039 | Priority number, date | NL20111038882 | 23.06.2011 Original published format: NL 1038882 | [2014/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012177120 | Date: | 27.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2723794 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C08G59/42, C08G59/50, C08G59/62, C08L63/00, C09D163/00 | [2014/18] | CPC: |
C08G59/502 (EP);
C08G59/42 (EP);
C08G59/5013 (EP);
C08G59/621 (EP);
C08L63/00 (EP);
C09D163/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/18] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ENTHALTEND EPOXYHARZEN UND EINE MISCHUNG AUS EINER POLYAMINE UND EINEM SUBSTITUIERTEM PHENOL | [2018/15] | English: | COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING EPOXY RESINS AND A MIXTURE OF A POLYAMINE AND SUBSTITUTED PHENOL | [2018/15] | French: | COMPOSITIONS COMPRENANT DES RESINES EPOXIDEES ET UN MÉLANGE D'UNE POLYAMINE ET D'UN PHENOL SUBSTITUÉ | [2018/15] |
Former [2014/18] | NEUE POLYMERE UND POLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | ||
Former [2014/18] | NOVEL POLYMERS AND POLYMER COMPOSITIONS | ||
Former [2014/18] | POLYMÈRES ET COMPOSITIONS POLYMÈRES NOUVEAUX | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/18] | 13.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 21.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/31] | 12.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.04.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3303165 (MARTIN WALLIS, et al) [A] 1-28 * claims 1,2 *; | [X]US3694409 (MILLER EUGENE J JR, et al) [X] 1-11,24-28 * column 4; table 2 *; | [X]DE2951603 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1-11,24-28 * page 8, line 9 - line 28 * * claims 1,5 *; | [A]EP0365479 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1-28 * claims 1,7.8 *; | [A]WO03054092 (UNICHEMA CHEMIE BV [NL], et al) [A] 1-28 * page 10, line 15 - line 16; claims 1-7 *; | [A]EP2028244 (CYTEC SURFACE SPECIALTIES AT [AT]) [A] 1-28* claims 5,6 * | by applicant | US2703765 | GB1362480 | DE2951603 | WO2010099281 | US2010308477 |