EP2666248 - UE CAPABILITY REPORT METHODS AND APPARATUSES IN MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/48] | UE CAPABILITY REPORT METHOD AND APPARATUS IN MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | ||
[2017/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [2017/44] |
Former [2013/48] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Soeng Hun No. 1208-1202 Shindong-ah Familie Apt. Yeongdeok-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-908 / KR | 02 /
VAN LIESHOUT, Gert-Jan Communications House South Street Staines Middlesex TW18 4QE / GB | 03 /
JEONG, Kyeong In No. 102-511 Woncheon Seongil Apt. Maetan 2-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-372 / KR | [2013/48] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2013/48] | Application number, filing date | 12736153.3 | 18.01.2012 | [2017/44] | WO2012KR00454 | Priority number, date | US201161433651P | 18.01.2011 Original published format: US 201161433651 P | US201161442985P | 15.02.2011 Original published format: US 201161442985 P | US201161471872P | 05.04.2011 Original published format: US 201161471872 P | KR20110139376 | 21.12.2011 Original published format: KR 20110139376 | [2013/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012099404 | Date: | 26.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2666248 | Date: | 27.11.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2666248 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.12.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/04, H04W8/24, H04W72/04, // H04W24/10, H04W88/06 | [2016/34] | CPC: |
H04W28/04 (EP,KR,US);
H04W24/10 (EP,KR,US);
H04W8/24 (US);
H04B17/24 (KR);
H04B7/0417 (KR);
H04W72/0453 (US);
|
Former IPC [2013/48] | H04B7/26, H04W24/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN VON BENUTZERGERÄTEKAPAZITÄTEN IN EINEM MOBILEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2017/20] | English: | UE CAPABILITY REPORT METHODS AND APPARATUSES IN MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2017/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREILS DE RAPPORT DE CAPACITÉ D'UE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE | [2017/20] |
Former [2013/48] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG VON BENUTZERGERÄTEKAPAZITÄTEN IN EINEM MOBILEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | ||
Former [2013/48] | UE CAPABILITY REPORT METHOD AND APPARATUS IN MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | ||
Former [2013/48] | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE RAPPORT DE CAPACITÉ D'UE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2013 | Search fee paid | 17.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/48] | 16.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.05.2017 | Opposition(s) | 02.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.01.2012 | AL | 01.11.2017 | AT | 01.11.2017 | CY | 01.11.2017 | CZ | 01.11.2017 | DK | 01.11.2017 | EE | 01.11.2017 | ES | 01.11.2017 | FI | 01.11.2017 | HR | 01.11.2017 | LT | 01.11.2017 | LV | 01.11.2017 | MC | 01.11.2017 | MK | 01.11.2017 | PL | 01.11.2017 | PT | 01.11.2017 | RO | 01.11.2017 | RS | 01.11.2017 | SE | 01.11.2017 | SI | 01.11.2017 | SK | 01.11.2017 | SM | 01.11.2017 | TR | 01.11.2017 | IE | 18.01.2018 | LU | 18.01.2018 | MT | 18.01.2018 | BE | 31.01.2018 | CH | 31.01.2018 | LI | 31.01.2018 | BG | 01.02.2018 | NO | 01.02.2018 | GR | 02.02.2018 | IS | 01.03.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 18.01.2012 | |
AT | 01.11.2017 | ||
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
MK | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PT | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
TR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IE | 18.01.2018 | ||
LU | 18.01.2018 | ||
MT | 18.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 18.01.2012 | |
AT | 01.11.2017 | ||
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PT | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
TR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IE | 18.01.2018 | ||
LU | 18.01.2018 | ||
MT | 18.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
TR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IE | 18.01.2018 | ||
LU | 18.01.2018 | ||
MT | 18.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
IE | 18.01.2018 | ||
LU | 18.01.2018 | ||
MT | 18.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
IE | 18.01.2018 | ||
LU | 18.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
IE | 18.01.2018 | ||
LU | 18.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
LU | 18.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
LU | 18.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
LU | 18.01.2018 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 01.11.2017 | |
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI] - NTT DOCOMO, "Further discussions on LTE-A UE categories/ capabilities", 3GPP DRAFT; R4-103847, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20101009), vol. RAN WG4, no. Xian; 20101011, XP050455497 [X] 1,7,8,14 * 1 Introduction * * 2.1 Signalling for CA/MIMO combinations * * 3 Conclusions * * table 3 * [Y] 2,3,9,10 [I] 1,4-8,11-14 | [Y] - ERICSSON ET AL, "Measurement gap capability signalling for CA", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-110325 MEASUREMENT GAP CAPABILITY SIGNALLING FOR CA, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110111), vol. RAN WG2, no. Dublin, Ireland; 20110117, XP050492990 [Y] 2,3,9,10 * 1 Introduction * * 2 Background * * 3 Discusssion * * table 3 * | [A] - VODAFONE, "Updated TP for UE Capability Handling in TS 36.331", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-085952, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20081008), no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20081008, XP050320663 [A] 1-14 * 5.6.3 UE capability transfer * | [T] - SAMSUNG, "UE capability signaling structure w.r.t carrier aggregation, MIMO and measurement gap", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-110874 CA_MIMO CAPABILITY, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110215), vol. RAN WG2, no. Taipei, Taiwan; 20110221, XP050493635 [T] 1-14 * the whole document * | [T] - SAMSUNG, "Clarification on BandCombinationParameters", 3GPP DRAFT; 36331_CR0641R1_(REL-10)_R2-111625, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110225), vol. RAN WG2, no. Taipei, Taiwan; 20110221, XP050494024 [T] 1-14 * Reason for change * * Summary of change * | International search | [Y]US2010159919 (WU CHIH-HSIANG [TW]); | [Y] - NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS ET AL., "UE capability signalling for CA and MIMO in REL10", 3GPP TSG RAN WG2 MEETING #72, R2-106892, (20101115), XP050492565 | [A] - NOKIA CORPORATION ET AL., "Correction to UE system specific capability for EUTRA", 3GPP TSG RAN WG2 MEETING #72, R2-106483, (20101115), XP050491996 | [A] - RESEARCH IN MOTION LIMITED, "Addition of UE-EUTRA-Capability description", 3GPP TSG RAN WG2 MEETING #72, R2-106137, (20101115), XP050491959 |