06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
11.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
23.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.09.2019 [2019/39] |
28.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
23.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
08.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] |
17.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] |
20.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] |
06.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] |
18.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
28.04.2017 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 31.05.2017 [2017/22] |
24.03.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.04.2017 [2017/17] |
24.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] |
17.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] |
10.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] |
03.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] |
27.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] |
25.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.12.2016 [2016/52] |
18.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] |
11.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] |
04.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] |
14.10.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.11.2016 [2016/46] |
20.05.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] |
17.05.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
17.05.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
17.05.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
02.02.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.01.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.11.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] |
04.11.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] |
19.09.2015 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
11.09.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
11.09.2015 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
10.09.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
30.06.2015 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.01.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.10.2014 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 19.11.2014 [2014/47] |
17.10.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 19.11.2014 [2014/47] |
17.10.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 19.11.2014 [2014/47] |
28.03.2014 |
Change - extension states |
published on 30.04.2014 [2014/18] |
07.03.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
01.02.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.10.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] |
25.10.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] |
05.08.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.07.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.07.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.11.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.08.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.07.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|