Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012100254 | Global Dossier | 26.10.2012 | A3 | WO2012100254 | 26.07.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201213356198 | 23.01.2012 | US201161435278 | 22.01.2011 | US201161521263 | 08.08.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8705977 | Global Dossier | 22.04.2014 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US201161435278 | 22.01.2011 | US201213356192 | 23.01.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8682180 | Global Dossier | 25.03.2014 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US201213356177 | 23.01.2012 | US201161435278 | 22.01.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8639126 | Global Dossier | 28.01.2014 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US201161435278 | 22.01.2011 | US201213356159 | 23.01.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8886051 | Global Dossier | 11.11.2014 | B2 | US2014161470 | 12.06.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414178986 | 12.02.2014 | US201113205441 | 08.08.2011 | US201161435278 | 22.01.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8891980 | Global Dossier | 18.11.2014 | B2 | US2014153920 | 05.06.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113205431 | 08.08.2011 | US201161435278 | 22.01.2011 | US201414176771 | 10.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9100125 | Global Dossier | 04.08.2015 | B2 | US2014079406 | 20.03.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213356198 | 23.01.2012 | US201161435278 | 22.01.2011 | US201314028157 | 16.09.2013 | US201161521263 | 08.08.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8559828 | Global Dossier | 15.10.2013 | B2 | US2012189322 | 26.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213356198 | 23.01.2012 | US201161435278 | 22.01.2011 | US201161521263 | 08.08.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6057383B | Global Dossier | 11.01.2017 | B2 | JP2014510436 | 24.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201213356198 | 23.01.2012 | WO2012US22234 | 23.01.2012 | US201161435278 | 22.01.2011 | US201161521263 | 08.08.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6057382B | Global Dossier | 11.01.2017 | B2 | JP2014509121 | 10.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113205431 | 08.08.2011 | US201161435278 | 22.01.2011 | WO2012US22231 | 23.01.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2666249 | Global Dossier | 11.03.2015 | A4 | EP2666249 | 27.11.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201213356198 | 23.01.2012 | WO2012US22234 | 23.01.2012 | US201161435278 | 22.01.2011 | US201161521263 | 08.08.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103329497 | Global Dossier | 25.09.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113205431 | 08.08.2011 | US201161435278 | 22.01.2011 | WO2012US22231 | 23.01.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103329462B | Global Dossier | 04.03.2015 | B | CN103329462 | 25.09.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201213356198 | 23.01.2012 | WO2012US22234 | 23.01.2012 | US201161435278 | 22.01.2011 | US201161521263 | 08.08.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2666272 | Global Dossier | 22.06.2016 | B1 | EP2666272 | 19.11.2014 | A4 | EP2666272 | 27.11.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201113205431 | 08.08.2011 | US201161435278 | 22.01.2011 | WO2012US22231 | 23.01.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012100253 | Global Dossier | 01.11.2012 | A3 | WO2012100253 | 26.07.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201113205431 | 08.08.2011 | US201161435278 | 22.01.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8705664 | Global Dossier | 22.04.2014 | B2 | US2012189324 | 26.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113205435 | 08.08.2011 | US201161435278 | 22.01.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8687974 | Global Dossier | 01.04.2014 | B2 | US2012189320 | 26.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113205441 | 08.08.2011 | US201161435278 | 22.01.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8744279 | Global Dossier | 03.06.2014 | B2 | US2012189319 | 26.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161435278 | 22.01.2011 | US201113205437 | 08.08.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8693897 | Global Dossier | 08.04.2014 | B2 | US2012189318 | 26.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113205431 | 08.08.2011 | US201161435278 | 22.01.2011 |