EP2666531 - THREE DIMENSIONAL CINEMA SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.12.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.01.2018 [2018/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Choi, Hae Yong 108-301 IPark Apartment 385 Mook-dong Jungryang-gu Seoul 131-768 / KR | [2013/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/48] | Representative(s) | Mittler, Enrico, et al Mittler & C. S.r.l. Viale Lombardia, 20 20131 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2013/48] | Mittler, Enrico, et al Mittler & C. S.r.l. Viale Lombardia, 20 20131 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 12736259.8 | 20.01.2012 | WO2012KR00518 | Priority number, date | KR20110006109 | 21.01.2011 Original published format: KR 20110006109 | [2013/48] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012099431 | Date: | 26.07.2012 | Language: | KO | [2012/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2666531 | Date: | 27.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.12.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A63J13/00, G03B35/00, H04N5/74, E04H3/22 | [2017/04] | CPC: |
G03B35/20 (EP,GB,US);
A63J13/00 (KR);
H04N5/7408 (GB);
A63J25/00 (EP,US);
E04H3/22 (EP,US);
G03B21/28 (EP,GB,US);
G03B21/54 (EP,GB,US);
G03B35/00 (KR);
G03B35/18 (US);
G03B35/26 (EP,GB,US);
H04N13/337 (EP,US);
H04N13/363 (EP,GB,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/48] | A63J13/00, G03B35/00, H04N5/74 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/48] | Title | German: | DREIDIMENSIONALES KINOSYSTEM | [2013/48] | English: | THREE DIMENSIONAL CINEMA SYSTEM | [2013/48] | French: | SYSTÈME CINÉMA TRIDIMENSIONNEL | [2013/48] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2013 | Translation filed | 02.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2013 | Search fee paid | 02.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/48] | 22.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/03] | 29.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US1681723 (ROBERT CLAS ANGELO) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2,3 [I] 4-7; | [A]US2003038925 (CHOI HAE-YONG [KR]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2005077715 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-3* figure 17 * | International search | [A]KR200164080Y (CHOI HAE YONG [KR]); | [A]KR20070007689 (CHOI HAE YONG [KR]); | [X]KR20090009194 (FALCON S TREEHOUSE L L C [US]) |