EP2873280 - TRACKING AREA LIST HANDLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2016 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.01.2017 [2017/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/21] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (PUBL) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CASTMO, Thomas Bergläkan 70 S-426 69 Västra Frölunda / SE | [2015/21] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/21] | Vejgaard, Christian Ericsson AB Patent Unit GL Lindholmspiren 11 417 56 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 12737531.9 | 16.07.2012 | WO2012EP63865 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014012568 | Date: | 23.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2873280 | Date: | 20.05.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04W60/00 | [2015/21] | CPC: |
H04W4/029 (EP,US);
H04W60/00 (EP,CN,US);
H04W4/021 (EP,US);
H04W68/00 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/21] | Title | German: | HANDHABUNG EINER VERFOLGUNGSBEREICHSLISTE | [2015/21] | English: | TRACKING AREA LIST HANDLING | [2015/21] | French: | GESTION DE LISTE DE ZONES DE SUIVI | [2015/21] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/21] | 20.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP2180729 (DATANG MOBILE COMM EQUIP CO [CN]) [A] 1-18 * abstract *; | [A]US2011294524 (TONTINUTTANANON CHANNARONG [US], et al) [A] 1,10 * abstract *; | [A]WO2012050491 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1,10* abstract * |