EP2727032 - METHODS FOR DESIGNING, SELECTING AND/OR OPTIMIZING ALLOSTERIC PROCESSING INHIBITORS FOR MATRIX METALLOPROTEINASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.09.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Janssen Pharmaceutica, N.V. Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | [2014/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEONARD, Kristi, A. 108 Manor Drive Lansdale, PA 19446 / US | 02 /
ALEXANDER, Richard, Scott 40 Bristol Lane Newark, DE 19711 / US | 03 /
BARBAY, Joseph, Kent 6311 Sunnybrook Road Flourtown, PA 19031 / US | 04 /
BONE, Roger, F. 797 Garfield Avenue Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | 05 /
DECKMAN, Ingrid, Christa 575 Woodside Avenue Berwyn, PA 19312 / US | 06 /
JACKSON, Paul, F. 2254 Bellflower Lane New Hope, PA 18938 / US | 07 /
KUO, Lawrence, C. 701 Penrith Place Gwynedd Valley, PA 19437 / US | 08 /
LEWANDOWSKI, Frank, A. 820 Summerset Drive Hockessin, DE 19707 / US | 09 /
MAGUIRE, Diane, M. 415 Church Street Downingtown, PA 19335 / US | 10 /
MILLIGAN, Cynthia, M. 220 Linden Avenue Rutledge, PA 19070 / US | 11 /
RHODES, Kenneth, J. 4 Front Street Hopkinton, MA 01748 / US | 12 /
SCANNEVIN, Robert, H. 26 Huckleberry Road Hopkinton, MA 01748 / US | 13 /
SCHALK-HIHI, Celine 70 Hawthorne Lane Phoenixville, PA 19460 / US | 14 /
SPRINGER, Barry 208 Charleston Drive Wilmington, DE 19808 / US | 15 /
SPURLINO, John, C. 109 Kaiser Drive Downingtown, PA 19335 / US | 16 /
TODD, Matthew, J. 413 Vineyard Lane Downington, PA 19335 / US | 17 /
TOUNGE, Brett, A. 1014 Blue Rock Lane Blue Bell, PA 19422 / US | 18 /
WANG, Aihua 1723 Foxwood Drive Jamison, PA 18929 / US | [2014/19] | Representative(s) | Warner, James Alexander Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2014/19] | Application number, filing date | 12737643.2 | 26.06.2012 | WO2012US44217 | Priority number, date | US201161502516P | 29.06.2011 Original published format: US 201161502516 P | [2014/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013003358 | Date: | 03.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2727032 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00, C12N9/64, G01N33/48 | [2014/19] | CPC: |
C12N9/6491 (EP,US);
G16B15/20 (EP,US);
G16B15/30 (EP,US);
G16B20/20 (EP,US);
G16B20/30 (EP,US);
G16B20/50 (EP,US);
G16B5/00 (EP,US);
G16C20/50 (EP,US);
G16B15/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/19] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM KONZIPIEREN, AUSWÄHLEN ODER OPTIMIEREN ALLOSTERISCHER PROZESSHEMMER FÜR MATRIX-METALLOPROTEINASEN | [2014/19] | English: | METHODS FOR DESIGNING, SELECTING AND/OR OPTIMIZING ALLOSTERIC PROCESSING INHIBITORS FOR MATRIX METALLOPROTEINASES | [2014/19] | French: | MÉTHODES DE CONCEPTION, DE SÉLECTION ET/OU D'OPTIMISATION D'INHIBITEURS DE TRAITEMENT ALLOSTÉRIQUES POUR MÉTALLOPROTÉINASES MATRICIELLES | [2014/19] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/19] | 01.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO03067219 (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X] - LEACH A, "Molecular Modelling, Principles and Applications; The use of molecular modelling and chemoinformatics to discover and design new molecules", MOLECULAR MODELLING: PRINCIPLES AND APPLICATIONS, XX, XX, (20010101), pages 640 - 726, XP002444241 [X] 1-12 * the whole document * | [A] - SELA-PASSWELL N ET AL, "Structural and functional bases for allosteric control of MMP activities: Can it pave the path for selective inhibition?", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA. MOLECULAR CELL RESEARCH, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 1803, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.BBAMCR.2009.04.010, ISSN 0167-4889, (20100101), pages 29 - 38, (20090503), XP026946661 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbamcr.2009.04.010 | by applicant | US4906122 | US5030103 | US5200910 | US5365456 | US5583973 | US5612894 | US5733720 | US5763263 | US5942428 | US5994503 | US5998593 | US6037117 | US6071700 | US6075014 | US6075123 | US6080576 | US6093573 | WO2005068444 | - J. MED. CHEM., (2006), vol. 49, page 1173 |