EP2726736 - REMOTE SENSING SYSTEM FOR WIND TURBINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.10.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vestas Wind Systems A/S Hedeager 42 8200 Aarhus N / DK | [2015/23] |
Former [2014/19] | For all designated states Vestas Wind Systems A/S Hedeager 44 8200 Aarhus N / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZAIB, Ali Danmarksgade 29 1.sal DK-9000 Aalborg / DK | 02 /
BOWYER, Robert 18 Adam Walk London SW6 6LE / GB | [2014/19] | Representative(s) | Vestas Patents Department Hedeager 42 8200 Aarhus N / DK | [2016/49] | Application number, filing date | 12738021.0 | 29.06.2012 | [2016/49] | WO2012DK50222 | Priority number, date | DK201170351P | 30.06.2011 Original published format: DK 201170351 P | US201161503644P | 01.07.2011 Original published format: US 201161503644 P | [2014/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013000475 | Date: | 03.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2726736 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2726736 | Date: | 07.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F03D7/04, F03D80/00, F03D7/00, G01W1/00, F03D17/00 | [2016/31] | CPC: |
F03D7/048 (EP,US);
F03D7/00 (US);
F03D17/00 (EP,US);
G01W1/00 (US);
F05B2260/8211 (EP,US);
F05B2270/32 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/19] | F03D7/04, F03D11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FERNMESSSYSTEM FÜR WINDTURBINEN | [2014/19] | English: | REMOTE SENSING SYSTEM FOR WIND TURBINES | [2014/19] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DÉTECTION À DISTANCE POUR TURBINES ÉOLIENNES | [2014/19] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/19] | 21.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.12.2015 | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.06.2012 | AL | 07.12.2016 | AT | 07.12.2016 | BE | 07.12.2016 | CY | 07.12.2016 | CZ | 07.12.2016 | DK | 07.12.2016 | EE | 07.12.2016 | FI | 07.12.2016 | HR | 07.12.2016 | IT | 07.12.2016 | LT | 07.12.2016 | LV | 07.12.2016 | MC | 07.12.2016 | MK | 07.12.2016 | NL | 07.12.2016 | PL | 07.12.2016 | RO | 07.12.2016 | RS | 07.12.2016 | SE | 07.12.2016 | SI | 07.12.2016 | SK | 07.12.2016 | SM | 07.12.2016 | TR | 07.12.2016 | BG | 07.03.2017 | NO | 07.03.2017 | GR | 08.03.2017 | IS | 07.04.2017 | PT | 07.04.2017 | IE | 29.06.2017 | LU | 29.06.2017 | MT | 29.06.2017 | CH | 30.06.2017 | LI | 30.06.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 29.06.2012 | |
AT | 07.12.2016 | ||
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CY | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
MK | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
TR | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
IE | 29.06.2017 | ||
LU | 29.06.2017 | ||
MT | 29.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 29.06.2012 | |
AT | 07.12.2016 | ||
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CY | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
MK | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
IE | 29.06.2017 | ||
LU | 29.06.2017 | ||
MT | 29.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 29.06.2012 | |
AT | 07.12.2016 | ||
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CY | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
IE | 29.06.2017 | ||
LU | 29.06.2017 | ||
MT | 29.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 29.06.2012 | |
AT | 07.12.2016 | ||
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
IE | 29.06.2017 | ||
LU | 29.06.2017 | ||
MT | 29.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
IE | 29.06.2017 | ||
LU | 29.06.2017 | ||
MT | 29.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
IE | 29.06.2017 | ||
LU | 29.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
LU | 29.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | BE | 07.12.2016 | |
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | FI | 07.12.2016 | |
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | FI | 07.12.2016 | |
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 07.12.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO03012293 (WOBBEN ALOYS [DE]) [A] 1-15 * page 2, line 26 - page 3, line 11 * * page 4, line 26 - page 5, line 4 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP1460266 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0082] * * figures 1,7,8 *; | [X]US2010133848 (PIASECKI FREDERICK W [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0087] * * paragraph [0102] - paragraph [0103] * * figures 12,15,16,17 *; | [A]DE102009030886 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0030] ** figures 1,5 *; | [X]WO2011022024 (CATCH THE WIND INC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0026] * * figures 1,2,3,4,5 *; | [X]WO2011036553 (PENTALUM TECHNOLOGIES LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 5, line 11 - line 27 * * page 7, line 9 - line 32 * * page 11, line 8 - page 12, line 9 * * page 12, line 21 - page 13, line 3 * * page 13, line 12 - page 14, line 16 * * page 14, line 24 - page 15, line 5 * * figures 1,2 * |