EP2737074 - Process for producing L-carnitine from beta-lactones employing lipases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/23] | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING L-CARNITINE FROM BETA-LACTONES EMPLOYING LIPASES | ||
[2015/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lonza Ltd Lonzastrasse 3930 Visp / CH | [2014/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AVI, Manuela Schützenstrasse 5 6330 Kufstein / AT | 02 /
KLEGRAF, Ellen Apollostrasse 8 CH-3902 Brig-Glis / CH | [2014/42] |
Former [2014/23] | 01 /
AVI, Manuela Jesuitenweg 168 CH-3902 Brig-Glis / CH | ||
02 /
KLEGRAF, Ellen Apollostrasse 8 CH-3902 Brig-Glis / CH | Representative(s) | Riegler, Norbert Hermann Lonza Ltd. Patent Department Münchensteinerstrasse 38 4052 Basel / CH | [2016/22] |
Former [2014/23] | Riegler, Norbert Hermann Lonza Ltd. Patent Department Münchensteinerstrasse 38 4052 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 12738462.6 | 25.07.2012 | [2016/22] | WO2012EP64575 | Priority number, date | EP20110006163 | 27.07.2011 Original published format: EP 11006163 | US201161512032P | 27.07.2011 Original published format: US 201161512032 P | [2014/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013014179 | Date: | 31.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2737074 | Date: | 04.06.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2737074 | Date: | 01.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C12P13/00, C12P7/42, C12P7/62, C12P41/00 | [2014/23] | CPC: |
C12P13/007 (EP,US);
C12P41/005 (EP,US);
C12P7/42 (EP,US);
C12P7/62 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von L-Carnitin aus beta-Lactonen unter Verwendung von Lipasen | [2015/51] | English: | Process for producing L-carnitine from beta-lactones employing lipases | [2015/51] | French: | Procédé de préparation de L-carnitine à partir de beta-lactones en utilisant des lipases | [2015/51] |
Former [2014/23] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON L-CARNITIN AUS BETA-LACTONEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON LIPASEN | ||
Former [2014/23] | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING L-CARNITINE FROM BETA-LACTONES EMPLOYING LIPASES | ||
Former [2014/23] | PROCÉDÉ POUR PRODUIRE DE LA L-CARNITINE À PARTIR DE BÊTA-LACTONES EN UTILISANT DES LIPASES | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/23] | 11.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.04.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 25.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.02.2015 | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.07.2012 | AL | 01.06.2016 | AT | 01.06.2016 | BE | 01.06.2016 | BG | 01.06.2016 | CY | 01.06.2016 | CZ | 01.06.2016 | DK | 01.06.2016 | EE | 01.06.2016 | ES | 01.06.2016 | FI | 01.06.2016 | HR | 01.06.2016 | IT | 01.06.2016 | LT | 01.06.2016 | LV | 01.06.2016 | MC | 01.06.2016 | MK | 01.06.2016 | NL | 01.06.2016 | PL | 01.06.2016 | RO | 01.06.2016 | RS | 01.06.2016 | SE | 01.06.2016 | SI | 01.06.2016 | SK | 01.06.2016 | SM | 01.06.2016 | TR | 01.06.2016 | IE | 25.07.2016 | LU | 25.07.2016 | MT | 31.07.2016 | NO | 01.09.2016 | GR | 02.09.2016 | IS | 01.10.2016 | PT | 03.10.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 25.07.2012 | |
AT | 01.06.2016 | ||
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
BG | 01.06.2016 | ||
CY | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
MK | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
TR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IE | 25.07.2016 | ||
LU | 25.07.2016 | ||
MT | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 25.07.2012 | |
AT | 01.06.2016 | ||
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
BG | 01.06.2016 | ||
CY | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
MK | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
IE | 25.07.2016 | ||
LU | 25.07.2016 | ||
MT | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 25.07.2012 | |
AT | 01.06.2016 | ||
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CY | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
MK | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
IE | 25.07.2016 | ||
LU | 25.07.2016 | ||
MT | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 25.07.2012 | |
AT | 01.06.2016 | ||
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CY | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
MK | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
IE | 25.07.2016 | ||
LU | 25.07.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 01.06.2016 | |
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
IE | 25.07.2016 | ||
LU | 25.07.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/17] | AT | 01.06.2016 | |
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 01.06.2016 | |
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 01.06.2016 | |
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 01.06.2016 | |
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | ES | 01.06.2016 | |
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 01.06.2016 | |
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 01.06.2016 | |
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 01.06.2016 | |
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 01.06.2016 | |
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 01.06.2016 | |
NO | 01.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [IDA]CH680588 (LONZA AG) [ID] 1-14 * page 2, line 14 - line 21 * * page 2, line 23 - line 46 * * page 4; claim 3 * [A] 15; | KR20090022032 [ ] (KOREA RES INST CHEM TECH [KR]); | [A]WO2009062731 (LONZA AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 2, line 4 - line 14 * * page 3 - page 5; examples 1-5 *; | [XA] - LEE, H. ET AL., "Method for preparing optically active alkyl 3-hydroxybutanoate derivative", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, (2009), Database accession no. 2009:278677, XP002666098 [X] 15 * the whole document * [A] 1-14 | [A] - SONG, C.E. ET AL., "New Method for the Preparation of (R)-Carnitine", TETRAHEDRON ASYMMETRY, (199505), vol. 6, no. 5, pages 1063 - 1066, XP004048201 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1063, line 10 - page 1064, line 26 * * scheme: 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0957-4166(95)00125-9 | [A] - "Burkholderia cepacia triacylglycerol lipase sequence, SEQ ID 177", Geneseq, (20090108), Database accession no. AUR75024, XP002682343 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - "Candida antarctica lipase B protein SEQ ID:1", Geneseq, (20100114), Database accession no. AXW34320, XP002682344 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5473104 | CH680588 | US2006046286 | US2007213524 | - NELSON; SPENCER, J. ORG. CHEM., (2000), vol. 65, pages 1227 - 1230 | - JOERGENSEN ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (1991), vol. 173, pages 559 - 567 | - DALAL ET AL., J. BIOTECHNOL. APPL. BIOCHEM., (2008), vol. 51, pages 23 - 31 | - YANG ET AL., J. MOL. CATAL., B ENZYM., (2007), vol. 45, pages 91 - 96 | - PUECH-GUENOT ET AL., J. BIOMOL. SCREEN., (2008), vol. 13, no. 1, pages 72 - 79 | - QIAN ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (2009), vol. 393, pages 191 - 201 | - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (2007), vol. 48, no. 10, pages 1749 - 1752 |