EP2739390 - METHOD OF CONVERTING AT LEAST AN ALCOHOL INTO LIGHT OLEFINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/24] | USE OF A CATALYST COMPRISING A PHOSPHORUS MODIFIED ZEOLITE IN AN ALCOHOL DEHYDRATION PROCESS | ||
[2020/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2022 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.09.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOTAL RESEARCH & TECHNOLOGY FELUY Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe / BE | For all designated states IFP Energies nouvelles 1 & 4 avenue de Bois-Préau 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [2017/44] |
Former [2014/24] | For all designated states TOTAL RESEARCH & TECHNOLOGY FELUY Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe / BE | ||
For all designated states IFP Energies nouvelles 1 & 4, Avenue de Bois Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NESTERENKO, Nikolai Chaussée de Namur, 86 1402 Nivelles / BE | 02 /
MINOUX, Delphine Rue des Hautes Hurées 21 1400 Nivelles / BE | 03 /
ADAM, Cindy rue des Reines des Prés 7 5100 Wierde / BE | 04 /
DATH, Jean-Pierre Rue d'Ath 53 7970 Beloeil / BE | 05 /
LOPEZ, Joseph 308 chemin de Granaudy 30340 Saint Julien les Rosiers / FR | 06 /
EUZEN, Patrick 14 rue Moliere 75001 Paris / FR | [2021/10] |
Former [2014/27] | 01 /
NESTERENKO, Nikolai Chaussée de Namur, 86 B-1402 Nivelles / BE | ||
02 /
MINOUX, Delphine Rue des Hautes Hurées 21 B-1400 Nivelles / BE | |||
03 /
ADAM, Cindy rue des Reines des Prés 7 B-5100 Wierde / BE | |||
04 /
DATH, Jean-Pierre Rue d'Ath 53 7970 Beloeil / BE | |||
05 /
LOPEZ, Joseph 308 chemin de Granaudy F-30340 Saint Julien les Rosiers / FR | |||
06 /
EUZEN, Patrick 14 rue Moliere F-75001 Paris / FR | |||
Former [2014/24] | 01 /
NESTERENKO, Nikolai Boîte 21 bât. 32 Chausséede Namur B-1400 Nivelles / BE | ||
02 /
MINOUX, Delphine Rue des Hautes Hurées 21 B-1400 Nivelles / BE | |||
03 /
ADAM, Cindy rue des Reines des Prés 7 B-5100 Wierde / BE | |||
04 /
DATH, Jean-Pierre Rue d'Ath 53 7970 Beloeil / BE | |||
05 /
LOPEZ, Joseph 308 chemin de Granaudy F-30340 Saint Julien les Rosiers / FR | |||
06 /
EUZEN, Patrick 14 rue Moliere F-75001 Paris / FR | Representative(s) | Raboin, Jean-Christophe, et al Total Research & Technology Feluy Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe / BE | [2021/10] |
Former [2014/24] | Leyder, Francis Total Research & Technology Feluy Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe / BE | Application number, filing date | 12738463.4 | 25.07.2012 | [2021/10] | WO2012EP64579 | Priority number, date | EP20110290360 | 03.08.2011 Original published format: EP 11290360 | [2014/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013017496 | Date: | 07.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2739390 | Date: | 11.06.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2739390 | Date: | 10.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B01J29/40, B01J29/85, B01J37/10, B01J37/28, C07C1/20 | [2014/24] | CPC: |
C07C1/24 (EP,US);
B01J29/40 (EP,US);
B01J29/85 (EP,US);
B01J37/10 (EP,US);
B01J37/28 (EP,US);
C07C2527/14 (EP,US);
C07C2529/06 (US);
C07C2529/40 (EP,US);
Y02P20/52 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C1/24, C07C11/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR UMWANDLUNG MINDESTENS EINES ALKOHOLS IN LEICHTE OLEFINE | [2020/44] | English: | METHOD OF CONVERTING AT LEAST AN ALCOHOL INTO LIGHT OLEFINS | [2020/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CONVERSION D'AU MOINS UN ALCOOL EN OLÉFINES LÉGÈRES | [2020/44] |
Former [2014/24] | VERWENDUNG EINES KATALYSATORS MIT EINEM PHOSPHORMODIFIZIERTEN ZEOLITH IN EINEM ALKOHOLDEHYDRIERVERFAHREN | ||
Former [2014/24] | USE OF A CATALYST COMPRISING A PHOSPHORUS MODIFIED ZEOLITE IN AN ALCOHOL DEHYDRATION PROCESS | ||
Former [2014/24] | UTILISATION D'UN CATALYSEUR COMPRENANT UNE ZÉOLITHE MODIFIÉE PAR DU PHOSPHORE DANS UN PROCÉDÉ DE DÉSHYDRATATION D'ALCOOLS | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/24] | 11.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.01.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.01.2016 | Opposition(s) | 13.12.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.07.2012 | AL | 10.03.2021 | AT | 10.03.2021 | CY | 10.03.2021 | EE | 10.03.2021 | HR | 10.03.2021 | LT | 10.03.2021 | LV | 10.03.2021 | MC | 10.03.2021 | MK | 10.03.2021 | RO | 10.03.2021 | RS | 10.03.2021 | SI | 10.03.2021 | SM | 10.03.2021 | BG | 10.06.2021 | NO | 10.06.2021 | GR | 11.06.2021 | IS | 10.07.2021 | PT | 12.07.2021 | IE | 25.07.2021 | LU | 25.07.2021 | CH | 31.07.2021 | LI | 31.07.2021 | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/29] | HU | 25.07.2012 | |
AL | 10.03.2021 | ||
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CY | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
IE | 25.07.2021 | ||
LU | 25.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CY | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
IE | 25.07.2021 | ||
LU | 25.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
IE | 25.07.2021 | ||
LU | 25.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
LU | 25.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | HR | 10.03.2021 | |
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | HR | 10.03.2021 | |
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | HR | 10.03.2021 | |
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | LT | 10.03.2021 | |
NO | 10.06.2021 | Cited in | International search | [XD]US4356338 (YOUNG LEWIS B) [XD] 1-23* example -; claim - *; | [XD]EP0511013 (ARCO CHEM TECH [US]) [XD] 1-23 * example -; claim - *; | [X]EP2082802 (TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS RES FELUY [BE]) [X] 1-23 * example -; claim - *; | [X]WO2009098262 (TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS RES FELUY [BE], et al) [X] 1-23 * example -; claim - *; | [X]EP2348004 (TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS RES FELUY [BE]) [X] 1-23 * example -; claim - * | Examination | WO2013017498 | WO2013017497 | WO2013017499 | by applicant | US3274124 | US3909450 | US3972832 | US4356338 | US4988659 | EP0511013 | US5231064 | EP0568913 | WO03020667 | US2006106270 | WO2009022990 | EP2082802 | WO2009098262 | WO2009098267 | WO2009098268 | WO2009098269 | EP2348004 |