EP2723652 - SAMPLE BAG FOR LIQUID PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/18] | SACHET FOR A SAMPLE OF A FLUID PRODUCT | ||
[2014/45] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.09.2015 [2015/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Socoplan 104 Route de Parthenay 79100 Saint Jean de Thouars / FR | [2014/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOUSSION, Philippe 38 rue de la Luzabert 79100 Misse / FR | 02 /
SIBILEAU, Guy-Noël 21 rue du Tilleul 79330 Saint-Varent / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/18] | 01 /
MOUSSION, Philippe 38 rue de la Luzabert F-79100 Misse / FR | ||
02 /
SIBILEAU, Guy-Noël 21 rue du Tilleul F-79330 Saint-Varent / FR | Representative(s) | Derambure Conseil C/o Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/18] | Derambure Conseil 52 rue de la Victoire FR-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 12738517.7 | 22.06.2012 | WO2012FR51437 | Priority number, date | FR20110055658 | 27.06.2011 Original published format: FR 1155658 | [2014/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013001217 | Date: | 03.01.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2723652 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B65D75/58, B65D75/26, B65D75/30, A45D40/00 | [2014/18] | CPC: |
B65D75/30 (EP,US);
A45D37/00 (EP,US);
A45D40/0087 (EP,US);
B65D75/26 (EP,US);
B65D75/58 (US);
B65D75/5855 (EP,US);
B65D2221/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/18] | Title | German: | MUSTERBEUTEL FÜR FLÜSSIGE PRODUKTE | [2014/45] | English: | SAMPLE BAG FOR LIQUID PRODUCTS | [2014/45] | French: | SACHET D'ECHANTILLON DE PRODUIT FLUIDE | [2014/18] |
Former [2014/18] | BEUTEL FÜR EINE PROBE EINES FLÜSSIGEN PRODUKTS | ||
Former [2014/18] | SACHET FOR A SAMPLE OF A FLUID PRODUCT | Entry into regional phase | 24.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 24.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/18] | 01.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/40] | 18.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.12.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]FR2599716 (PLANCHARD CHRISTIAN [FR]) [AD] 1-24 * abstract * * page 7, line 10 - page 8, line 27 *; | [AD]FR2908748 (LCE SA [FR]) [AD] 1-24 * abstract * * page 3, line 20 - page 6, paragraph 1 *; | [AD]US2007158399 (KHALSA SORAM S [US], et al) [AD] 1-24 * abstract * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0025] *; | [AD]WO9856568 (ARCADE INC [US]) [AD] 1-24 * abstract *; | [AD]US2005061710 (DOBLER SVEN [US]) [AD] 1-24 * abstract * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0046] *; | [AD]US2005011794 (CALDWELL KIMBERLY M [US], et al) [AD] 1-24 * abstract * | by applicant | EP1034073 | US2005061710 | US2005011794 | FR2599716 | FR2908748 | US2007158399 |