EP2668207 - PATHOGENIC MYCOBACTERIA-DERIVED MANNOSE-CAPPED LIPOARABINOMANNAN ANTIGEN BINDING PROTEINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National University of Singapore 21 Lower Kent Ridge Road Singapore 119077 / SG | For all designated states DSO National Laboratories 20 Science Park Drive Singapore 118230 / SG | [2013/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MACARY, Paul Anthony c/o National University of Singapore Yong Loo Lin School of Medicine Department of Microbiology 21 Lower Kent Ridge Road Singapore 119077 / SG | 02 /
CHAN, Conrad En Zuo c/o National University of Singapore Yong Loo Lin School of Medicine Department of Microbiology 21 Lower Kent Ridge Road Singapore 119077 / SG | 03 /
HANSON, Brendon John c/o DSO National Laboratories 20 Science Park Drive Singapore 118230 / SG | 04 /
WENK, Markus R c/o National University of Singapore Yong Loo Lin School of Medicine Department of Biochemistry 21 Lower Kent Ridge Road Singapore 119077 / SG | [2013/49] | Representative(s) | Goodfellow, Hugh Robin Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2013/49] | Application number, filing date | 12739329.6 | 25.01.2012 | WO2012SG00022 | Priority number, date | US201161435396P | 24.01.2011 Original published format: US 201161435396 P | [2013/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012102679 | Date: | 02.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2668207 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 02.08.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/12, G01N33/569, A61K39/40, A61P31/06 | [2013/49] | CPC: |
C07K16/1289 (EP,US);
A61P31/06 (EP);
G01N33/5695 (EP,US);
C07K2317/21 (EP,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,US);
C07K2317/33 (EP,US);
C07K2317/52 (EP,US);
C07K2317/522 (EP,US);
C07K2317/55 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/49] | Title | German: | AUS KRANKHEITSERREGENDEN MYKOBAKTERIEN GEWONNENE MANNOSE-GEKAPSELTE LIPOARABINOMANNAN-ANTIGEN-BINDENDE PROTEINE | [2013/49] | English: | PATHOGENIC MYCOBACTERIA-DERIVED MANNOSE-CAPPED LIPOARABINOMANNAN ANTIGEN BINDING PROTEINS | [2013/49] | French: | PROTÉINES DE LIAISON À L'ANTIGÈNE LIPOARABINOMANNANE COIFFÉ D'UN MANNOSE PROVENANT DE MYCOBACTÉRIES PATHOGÈNES | [2013/49] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2013 | Search fee paid | 23.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/49] | 07.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/13] | 09.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.05.2016 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 28.09.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 28.09.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.10.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2006078164 (SCHAPPELIJK ONDERZOEK EN PATIE [NL], et al) [X] 1,3,4,12,14 * page 9, line 27 - line 32 * * examples 1,2 * [I] 2,5-11,13,15; | [I] - B. HAMASUR ET AL, "A mycobacterial lipoarabinomannan specific monoclonal antibody and its F(ab')2 fragment prolong survival of mice infected with Mycobacterium tuberculosis", CLINICAL & EXPERIMENTAL IMMUNOLOGY, (20041001), vol. 138, no. 1, doi:10.1111/j.1365-2249.2004.02593.x, ISSN 0009-9104, pages 30 - 38, XP055186233 [I] 5,11 * abstract * * page 31, column r, paragraph 4 - page 32, column l, paragraph 4 * * discussion;; figures 2-6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2249.2004.02593.x | [A] - MCKAY BROWN ET AL, "Tolerance to single, but not multiple, amino acid replacements in antibody V-H CDR2: A means of minimizing B cell wastage from somatic hypermutation?", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF IMMUNOLOGISTS, US, (19960101), vol. 156, no. 9, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 3285 - 3291, XP002649029 [A] 2-15 * abstract * | [A] - WARK K L ET AL, "Latest technologies for the enhancement of antibody affinity", ADVANCED DRUG DELIVERY REVIEWS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 58, no. 5-6, doi:10.1016/J.ADDR.2006.01.025, ISSN 0169-409X, (20060807), pages 657 - 670, (20060807), XP024892147 [A] 1-4 * page 659, column l, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.addr.2006.01.025 | International search | [X]WO2005010151 (ABGENIX INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2009094551 (AMGEN INC [US], et al); | [X] - DRIESSEN N.N. ET AL, "Role of Phosphatidylinositol Mannosides in the interaction between Mycobacteria and DC-SIGN", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, (2009), vol. 77, no. 10, pages 4538 - 4547, XP055114219 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/IAI.01256-08 | [X] - APPELMELK B.J. ET AL, "The mannose cap of mycobacterial lipoarabinomannan does not dominate the Mycobacterium-host interaction", CELLULAR MICROBIOLOGY, (2008), vol. 10, no. 4, pages 930 - 944, XP055114220 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1462-5822.2007.01097.x | by applicant | US3773919 | US4179337 | EP0036676 | US4301144 | EP0058481 | US4399216 | EP0088046 | US4496689 | EP0133988 | EP0143949 | US4640835 | US4670417 | WO8801649 | US4740461 | US4791192 | US4912040 | US4946778 | US4959455 | US5006309 | US5089424 | WO9203918 | WO9222645 | WO9222647 | WO9222670 | EP0546073 | WO9312227 | US5260203 | WO9400569 | WO9402602 | WO9425585 | WO9614436 | EP0463151 | US5545807 | US5545806 | WO9634096 | US5591669 | US5612205 | WO9713852 | US5625825 | US5625126 | EP0773288 | US5633425 | US5643763 | US5661016 | EP0546073 | US5721367 | EP0843961 | WO9824893 | WO9824884 | US5770429 | US5789650 | US5789215 | US5814318 | US5874299 | US5877397 | US5885793 | WO9925044 | US5939598 | US5981175 | US6023010 | US6075181 | JP3068180B | JP3068506B | JP3068507B | US6114598 | US6133426 | US6150584 | US6162963 | WO0076310 | US6255458 | WO0183525 | US2003093820 | US6660843 | WO2006078164 | US2012009196 | - APPELMELK et al., Cellular Microbiology, (20080000), vol. 10, pages 930 - 944 | - DRIESSEN et al., Infection and Immunity, (20090000), vol. 77, pages 4538 - 4547 | - HAMASUR et al., Clin Exp Immunol, (20040000), vol. 138, pages 30 - 38 | - NIGOU, J.; M. GILLERON; G. PUZO, "Lipoarabinomannans: from structure to biosynthesis", Biochimie, (20030000), vol. 85, no. 1-2, pages 153 - 66 | - GRAHAM et al., Virology, (19730000), vol. 52, page 456 | - CHU et al., Gene, (19810000), vol. 13, page 197 | - Griffin, A. M., and Griffin, H. G., Computer Analysis of Sequence Data, Humana Press, (19940000), 1 | - CARILLO et al., SIAM J. Applied Math., (19880000), vol. 48, page 1073 | - DEVEREUX et al., Nucl. Acid Res., (19840000), vol. 12, page 387 | - Genetics Computer Group, University of Wisconsin | - DAYHOFF et al., Atlas of Protein Sequence and Structure, (19780000), vol. 5, pages 345 - 352 | - HENIKOFF et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. U.S.A., (19920000), vol. 89, pages 10915 - 10919 | - NEEDLEMAN et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19700000), vol. 48, pages 443 - 453 | - KYTE et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19820000), vol. 157, pages 105 - 131 | - FAUCHERE, J., Adv. Drug Res., (19860000), vol. 15, page 29 | - VEBER; FREIDINGER, TINS, (19850000), page 392 | - EVANS et al., J. Med. Chem., (19870000), vol. 30, page 1229 | - RIZO; GIERASCH, Ann. Rev. Biochem., (19920000), vol. 61, page 387 | - SONGSIVILAI; LACHMANN, Clin. Exp. Immunol., (19900000), vol. 79, pages 315 - 321 | - KOSTELNY et al., J. Immunol., (19920000), vol. 148, pages 1547 - 1553 | - CHOTHIA; LESK, J. Mol. Biol., (19870000), vol. 196, pages 901 - 917 | - CHOTHIA et al., Nature, (19890000), vol. 342, pages 878 - 883 | - JOHNSON; WU, Nucleic Acids Res., (20000000), vol. 28, pages 214 - 8 | - CHOTHIA et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19860000), vol. 196, pages 901 - 17 | - CHOTHIA et al., Nature, (19890000), vol. 342, pages 877 - 83 | - MARTIN et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci (USA, (19890000), vol. 86, pages 9268 - 9272 | - AbMTM, A Computer Program for Modeling Variable Regions of Antibodies, Oxford Molecular, Ltd. | - SAMUDRALA et al., "Ab Initio Protein Structure Prediction Using a Combined Hierarchical Approach", PROTEINS, Structure, Function and Genetics, (19990000), vol. 3, pages 194 - 198, XP001146416 | - MACCALLUM et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19960000), vol. 5, pages 732 - 45 | - SONGSIVILAI et al., Clin. Exp. Immunol., (19900000), vol. 79, pages 315 - 321 | - STAHLI et al., Methods in Enzymology, (19830000), vol. 9, pages 242 - 253 | - KIRKLAND et al., J. Immunol., (19860000), vol. 137, pages 3614 - 3619 | - MOREL et al., Molec. Immunol., (19880000), vol. 25, pages 7 - 15 | - CHEUNG et al., Virology, (19900000), vol. 176, pages 546 - 552 | - MOLDENHAUER et al., Scand. J. Immunol., (19900000), vol. 32, pages 77 - 82 | - MOULT J., Curr. Op. in Biotech., (19960000), vol. 7, no. 4, pages 422 - 427 | - CHOU et al., Biochemistry, (19740000), vol. 13, no. 2, pages 222 - 245 | - CHOU et al., Biochemistry, (19740000), vol. 113, no. 2, pages 211 - 222 | - CHOU et al., Adv. Enzymol. Relat. Areas Mol. Biol., (19780000), vol. 47, pages 45 - 148 | - CHOU et al., Ann. Rev. Biochem., vol. 47, pages 251 - 276 | - CHOU et al., Biophys. J., (19790000), vol. 26, pages 367 - 384 | - HOLM et al., Nucl. Acid. Res., (19990000), vol. 27, no. 1, pages 244 - 247 | - BRENNER et al., Curr. Op. Struct. Biol., (19970000), vol. 7, no. 3, pages 369 - 376 | - JONES, D., Curr. Opin. Struct. Biol., (19970000), vol. 7, no. 3, pages 377 - 87 | - SIPPL et al., Structure, (19960000), vol. 4, no. 1, pages 15 - 19 | - BOWIE et al., Science, (19910000), vol. 253, pages 164 - 170 | - GRIBSKOV et al., Meth. Enzym., (19900000), vol. 183, pages 146 - 159 | - GRIBSKOV et al., Proc. Nat. Acad. Sci. USA, (19870000), vol. 84, no. 13, pages 4355 - 4358 | - THORNTON et al., Nature, (19910000), vol. 354, page 105 | - DAYHOFF, M. O., Atlas of Protein Sequence and Structure, National Biomedical Research Foundation, (19720000), vol. 5, pages 101 - 110 | - HUDSON, Curr. Opin. Biotech., (19990000), vol. 9, pages 395 - 402 | - CHOWDHURY; PASTAN, Nature Biotech., (19990000), vol. 17, pages 568 - 572 | - HOOGENBOOM et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19910000), vol. 227, page 381 | - MARKS et al., J Mol Biol, (19910000), vol. 222, page 581 | - MULLINAX et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci, (19900000), vol. 87, pages 8095 - 8099 | - MENDEZ et al., Nature Genetics, (19970000), vol. 15, pages 146 - 156 | - BRAMS et al., J. Immunol., (19980000), vol. 160, pages 2051 - 2058 | - CARBALLIDO et al., Nat. Med., (20000000), vol. 6, pages 103 - 106 | - MCCUNE et al., Science, (19880000), vol. 241, pages 1532 - 1639 | - LFVERSEN et al., Sem. Immunol., (19960000), vol. 8, pages 243 - 248 | - MARTENSSON et al., Immunol., (19940000), vol. 83, pages 1271 - 179 | - MOSIER et al., Nature, (19880000), vol. 335, pages 256 - 259 | - MARTENSSON et al., Immunol., (19950000), vol. 84, pages 224 - 230 | - MURPHY et al., Blood, (19950000), vol. 86, pages 1946 - 1953 | - ISHIDA et al., Cloning Stem Cells, (20020000), vol. 4, pages 91 - 102 | - SMITH et al., J. Virol., (19830000), vol. 46, page 584 | - ENGELHARD et al., Proc. Nat. Acad. Sci., (19940000), vol. 91, pages 3224 - 7 | - CAPALDI et al., Biochem. Biophys. Res. Comm., (19770000), vol. 76, page 425 | - SIDMAN et al., Biopolymers, (19830000), vol. 22, pages 547 - 556 | - LANGER et al., J. Biomed. Mater. Res., (19810000), vol. 15, pages 167 - 277 | - LANGER, Chem. Tech., (19820000), vol. 12, pages 98 - 105 | - EPPSTEIN et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19850000), vol. 82, pages 3688 - 3692 | - OELLERICH, M., J. Clin. Chem. Clin. BioChem, (19840000), vol. 22, page 895 904 | - A.L. LEHNINGER, Biochemistry, Worth Publishers, Inc. | - S. Colowick and N. Kaplan, Methods In Enzymology, Academic Press, Inc. | - CAREY; SUNDBERG, Advanced Organic Chemistry, 3rd ed., Plenum Press, (19920000), vol. A and B | - DE HAARD, H.J.W, "Construction of large naive Fab libraries", Methods Mol Biol, (20010000), vol. 178, pages 87 - 100 | - ADAMS, E. W.; RATNER, D. M.; BOKESCH, H. R.; MCMAHON, J. B.; O'KEEFE, B. R.; SEEBERGER, P. H., "Oligosaccharide and glycoprotein microarrays as tools in HIV glycobiology; glycan-dependent gp120/protein interactions", Chem Biol, (20040000), vol. 11, pages 875 - 881 | - RATNER, D. M.; PLANTE, O. J.; SEEBERGER, P. H., "A linear synthesis of branched high-mannose oligosaccharides from the HIV-1 viral surface envelope glycoprotein gp120", European Journal of Organic Chemistry, (20020000), doi:doi:10.1002/1099-0690(200203)2002:5<826::AID-EJOC826>3.0.CO;2-2, pages 826 - 833, XP055041433 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1099-0690(200203)2002:5<826::AID-EJOC826>3.0.CO;2-2 | - HOLEMANN, A.; STOCKER, B. L.; SEEBERGER, P. H., "Synthesis of a core arabinomannan oligosaccharide of Mycobacterium tuberculosis", J Org Chern, (20060000), vol. 71, pages 8071 - 8088 | - BOEHME, C. et al., "Detection of mycobacterial lipoarabinomannan with an antigen-capture ELISA in unprocessed urine of Tanzanian patients with suspected tuberculosis", Trans R Soc Trop Med Hyg, (20050000), vol. 99, no. 12, doi:doi:10.1016/j.trstmh.2005.04.014, pages 893 - 900, XP025362112 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.trstmh.2005.04.014 | - TESSEMA, T.A. et al., "Diagnostic evaluation of urinary lipoarabinomannan at an Ethiopian tuberculosis centre", Scand J Infect Dis, (20010000), vol. 33, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1080/003655401300077306, pages 279 - 84, XP002987576 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/003655401300077306 | - KAMBASHI, B. et al., "Utility of nucleic acid amplification techniques for the diagnosis of pulmonary tuberculosis in sub-Saharan Africa", Int J Tuberc Lung Dis, (20010000), vol. 5, no. 4, pages 364 - 9 | - PAI, M. et al., "Nucleic acid amplification tests in the diagnosis of tuberculous pleuritis: a systematic review and meta-analysis", BMC Infect Dis, (20040000), vol. 4, doi:doi:10.1186/1471-2334-4-6, page 6, XP021004039 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1471-2334-4-6 | - STEINGART, K.R. et al., "Sputum processing methods to improve the sensitivity of smear microscopy for tuberculosis: a systematic review", Lancet Infect Dis, (20060000), vol. 6, no. 10, doi:doi:10.1016/S1473-3099(06)70602-8, pages 664 - 74, XP024968691 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1473-3099(06)70602-8 | - ELLIOTT, A.M. et al., "egative sputum smear results in HIV-positive patients with pulmonary tuberculosis in Lusaka, Zambia", Tuber Lung Dis, (19930000), vol. 74, no. 3, pages 191 - 4 | - STEINGART, K.R. et al., "Commercial serological antibody detection tests for the diagnosis of pulmonary tuberculosis: a systematic review", PLoS Med, (20070000), vol. 4, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1371/journal.pmed.0040202, page e202, XP002637795 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pmed.0040202 | - PAI, M.; A. ZWERLING; D. MENZIES, "Systematic review: T-cell-based assays for the diagnosis of latent tuberculosis infection: an update", Ann Intern Med, (20080000), vol. 149, no. 3, pages 177 - 84 | - CHO, S.N. et al., "Production of monoclonal antibodies to lipoarabinomannan-B and use in the detection of mycobacterial antigens in sputum", Yonsei Med J, (19900000), vol. 31, no. 4, pages 333 - 8, XP002035610 | - PEREIRA ARIAS-BOUDA, L.M. et al., "Development of antigen detection assay for diagnosis of tuberculosis using sputum samples", J Clin Microbiol, (20000000), vol. 38, no. 6, pages 2278 - 83, XP002535045 | - ARAJ, G.F. et al., "Improved detection of mycobacterial antigens in clinical specimens by combined enzyme-linked immunosorbent assay", Diagn Microbiol Infect Dis, (19930000), vol. 17, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1016/0732-8893(93)90022-Y, pages 119 - 27, XP023915457 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0732-8893(93)90022-Y | - PUROHIT, M.R. et al., "mmunohistochemical diagnosis of abdominal and lymph node tuberculosis by detecting Mycobacterium tuberculosis complex specific antigen MPT64", Diagn Pathol, (20070000), vol. 2, page 36, XP021039236 | - BABA, K. et al., "Rapid and specific diagnosis of tuberculous pleuritis with immunohistochemistry by detecting Mycobacterium tuberculosis complex specific antigen MPT64 in patients from a HIV endemic area", Appl Immunohistochem Mol Morphol, (20080000), vol. 16, no. 6, pages 554 - 61 | - HAMASUR, B. et al., "Rapid diagnosis of tuberculosis by detection of mycobacterial lipoarabinomannan in urine", J Microbiol Methods, (20010000), vol. 45, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1016/S0167-7012(01)00239-1, pages 41 - 52, XP002369551 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-7012(01)00239-1 | - BEN-SELMA, W. et al., "Rapid detection of Mycobacterium tuberculosis in sputum by Patho-TB kit in comparison with direct microscopy and culture", Diagn Microbiol Infect Dis, (20090000), vol. 65, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1016/j.diagmicrobio.2009.07.021, pages 232 - 5, XP026682686 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.diagmicrobio.2009.07.021 | - CHAKRABORTY, N. et al., "A rapid immunochromatographic assay for the detection of Mycobacterium tuberculosis antigens in pulmonary samples from HIV seropositive patients and its comparison with conventional methods", J Microbiol Methods, (20090000), vol. 76, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1016/j.mimet.2008.09.005, pages 12 - 7, XP025780010 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mimet.2008.09.005 | - SHAH, M. et al., "Diagnostic accuracy of a urine lipoarabinomannan test for tuberculosis in hospitalized patients in a High HIV prevalence setting", J Acquir Immune Defic Syndr, (20090000), vol. 52, no. 2, pages 145 - 51 | - REITHER, K. et al., "Low sensitivity of a urine LAM-ELISA in the diagnosis ofpulmonary tuberculosis", BMC Infect Dis, (20090000), vol. 9, page 141 | - LAWN, S.D. et al., "Urine lipoarabinomannan assay for tuberculosis screening before antiretroviral therapy diagnostic yield and association with immune reconstitution disease", Aids, (20090000), vol. 23, no. 14, pages 1875 - 80 | - DHEDA, K. et al., "Clinical utility of a commercial LAM-ELISA assay for TB diagnosis in HIV-infected patients using urine and sputum samples", PLoS One, (20100000), vol. 5, no. 3, page e9848 | - CHATTERJEE, D., "The mycobacterial cell wall: structure, biosynthesis and sites of drug action", Curr Opin Chem Biol, (19970000), vol. 1, no. 4, pages 579 - 88 | - SCHLESINGER, L.S.; S.R. HULL; T.M. KAUFMAN, "Binding of the terminal mannosyl units of lipoarabinomannan from a virulent strain of Mycobacterium tuberculosis to human macrophages", J Immunol, (19940000), vol. 152, no. 8, pages 4070 - 9 | - KANG, P.B. et al., "The human macrophage mannose receptor directs Mycobacterium tuberculosis lipoarabinomannan-mediated phagosome biogenesis", J Exp Med, (20050000), vol. 202, no. 7, doi:doi:10.1084/jem.20051239, pages 987 - 99, XP055065055 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.20051239 | - TORRELLES, J.B. et al., "Identification of Mycobacterium tuberculosis clinical isolates with altered phagocytosis by human macrophages due to a truncated lipoarabinomannan", J Biol Chem, (20080000), vol. 283, no. 46, pages 31417 - 28 | - MALIK, Z.A. et al., "Cutting edge: Mycobacterium tuberculosis blocks Ca2+ signaling and phagosome maturation in human macrophages via specific inhibition of sphingosine kinase", J Immunol, (20030000), vol. 170, no. 6, pages 2811 - 5 | - THOMPSON, C.R. et al., "Sphingosine kinase 1 (SKI) is recruited to nascent phagosomes in human macrophages: inhibition of SKI translocation by Mycobacterium tuberculosis", J Immunol, (20050000), vol. 174, no. 6, pages 3551 - 61 | - VERGNE, I.; J. CHUA; V. DERETIC, "Tuberculosis toxin blocking phagosome maturation inhibits a novel Ca2+/calmodulin-PI3K hVPS34 cascade", J Exp Med, (20030000), vol. 198, no. 4, pages 653 - 9 | - WELIN, A. et al., "Incorporation of Mycobacterium tuberculosis lipoarabinomannan into macrophage membrane rafts is a prerequisite for the phagosomal maturation block", Infect Immun, (20080000), vol. 76, no. 7, pages 2882 - 7 | - GEIJTENBEEK, T.B. et al., "Mycobacteria target DC-SIGN to suppress dendritic cell function", J Exp Med, (20030000), vol. 197, no. 1, pages 7 - 17 | - PATHAK, S.K. et al., "Mycobacterium tuberculosis lipoarabinomannan-mediated IRAK-M induction negatively regulates Toll-like receptor-dependent interleukin-12 p40 production in macrophages", J Biol Chem, (20050000), vol. 280, no. 52, pages 42794 - 800 | - FUJIWARA, N. et al., "Production and partial characterization of anti-cordfactor (trehalose-6,6'-dimycolate) IgG antibody in rabbits recognizing mycolic acid subclasses of Mycobacterium tuberculosis or Mycobacterium avium", FEMS Immunol Med Microbiol, (19990000), vol. 24, no. 2, pages 141 - 9 | - HAMASUR, B. et al., "A mycobacterial lipoarabinomannan specific monoclonal antibody and its F(ab') fragment prolong survival of mice infected with Mycobacterium tuberculosis", Clin Exp Immunol, (20040000), vol. 138, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1111/j.1365-2249.2004.02593.x, pages 30 - 8, XP055186233 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2249.2004.02593.x | - MEHTA, P.K.; G.K. KHULLER, "Protective immunity to experimental tuberculosis by mannophosphoinositides of mycobacteria", Med Microbiol Immunol, (19880000), vol. 177, no. 5, pages 265 - 84 | - HAMASUR, B. et al., "Mycobacterium tuberculosis arabinomannan-protein conjugates protect against tuberculosis", Vaccine, (20030000), vol. 21, no. 25-26, doi:doi:10.1016/S0264-410X(03)00274-3, pages 4081 - 93, XP004446186 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0264-410X(03)00274-3 | - HOOGENBOOM, H.R., "Selecting and screening recombinant antibody libraries", Nat Biotechnol, (20050000), vol. 23, no. 9, doi:doi:10.1038/nbt1126, pages 1105 - 16, XP002348401 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt1126 | US20120051590 | US19950464584 | US19950462837 | US19950486853 | US19950486859 | US19900466008 | US19900574748 | US19900575962 | US19910810279 | US19920853408 | US19920904068 | US19920919297 | US19920922649 | US19920990860 | WO1993US00829 | US19930031801 | US19930053131 | US19930096762 | US19930112848 | US19930161739 | US19930165699 | WO1994US01875 | US19940209741 | US19940234145 | US19950376279 | US19950430938 | US19950464582 | US19950463191 | US19950462513 | US19950486857 | US19960724752 | US19960759620 |