EP2668214 - TAPERED TRIBLOCK COPOLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dynasol Elastómeros, S.A.de C.V. Carretera Tampico-mante Km. 28.5 Col. Santa Amalia Altamira Tamaulipas 89602 / MX | [2013/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOCTEZUMA ESPIRICUETO, Sergio Alberto Bosque De Los Colorines 302 Residencial Los Encinos Altamira Tamaulipas 89606 / MX | 02 /
MONTERO CAMERERO, Enrique Maria Cardenal Cisneros 87 5 B. E-39007 Santader / ES | 03 /
HERNANDEZ ZAMORA, Gabriel Nicolás Bravo 204 Colonia Nuevo Progreso Tampico Tamaulipas 89318 / MX | 04 /
ESQUIVEL DE LA GARZA, Alejandro Claudio Jose Puente Cruz 215 Colonia Jesús Luna Luna Madero Tamaulipas 89514 / MX | 05 /
MENDIETA GARCÍA, Martha Belem Independencia 308 pte Colonia Obrera Madero Tamaulipas 89490 / MX | 06 /
BLANCO REYES, Gabriela Elizabeth Manuel Acuña 800 Colonia Los Mangos Madero Tamaulipas 89440 / MX | [2013/49] | Representative(s) | Eder, Michael df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | [2016/40] |
Former [2013/49] | Eder, Michael df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12739465.8 | 30.01.2012 | [2016/40] | WO2012IB00244 | Priority number, date | US201161437671P | 30.01.2011 Original published format: US 201161437671 P | [2013/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012101516 | Date: | 02.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2668214 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2668214 | Date: | 05.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.11.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C08F297/04, C09J153/02 | [2016/27] | CPC: |
C08F297/04 (EP,US);
C08L95/00 (EP,US);
C09J153/02 (EP,US);
Y10S525/94 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L95/00, C08L53/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/44] | C08F297/04 | ||
Former IPC [2013/49] | C08F236/10, C08F4/48 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GRADIENT-TRIBLOCK-COPOLYMERE | [2016/27] | English: | TAPERED TRIBLOCK COPOLYMERS | [2013/49] | French: | COPOLYMÈRES TRIBLOCS À GRADIENT | [2013/49] |
Former [2013/49] | KONISCHE TRIBLOCK-COPOLYMERE | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2013 | Search fee paid | 22.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/49] | 23.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.01.2012 | AL | 05.10.2016 | AT | 05.10.2016 | CY | 05.10.2016 | CZ | 05.10.2016 | DK | 05.10.2016 | EE | 05.10.2016 | FI | 05.10.2016 | HR | 05.10.2016 | LT | 05.10.2016 | LV | 05.10.2016 | MC | 05.10.2016 | MK | 05.10.2016 | RO | 05.10.2016 | RS | 05.10.2016 | SE | 05.10.2016 | SI | 05.10.2016 | SK | 05.10.2016 | SM | 05.10.2016 | TR | 05.10.2016 | BG | 05.01.2017 | NO | 05.01.2017 | GR | 06.01.2017 | IE | 30.01.2017 | LU | 30.01.2017 | MT | 30.01.2017 | CH | 31.01.2017 | LI | 31.01.2017 | IS | 05.02.2017 | PT | 06.02.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 30.01.2012 | |
AT | 05.10.2016 | ||
CY | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
MK | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
TR | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IE | 30.01.2017 | ||
LU | 30.01.2017 | ||
MT | 30.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 30.01.2012 | |
AT | 05.10.2016 | ||
CY | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
MK | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IE | 30.01.2017 | ||
LU | 30.01.2017 | ||
MT | 30.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 30.01.2012 | |
AT | 05.10.2016 | ||
CY | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IE | 30.01.2017 | ||
LU | 30.01.2017 | ||
MT | 30.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 30.01.2012 | |
AT | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IE | 30.01.2017 | ||
LU | 30.01.2017 | ||
MT | 30.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IE | 30.01.2017 | ||
LU | 30.01.2017 | ||
MT | 30.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IE | 30.01.2017 | ||
LU | 30.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
LU | 30.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 05.10.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5910546 (TREPKA WILLIAM J [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * table 13 *; | [X]US5256736 (TREPKA WILLIAM J [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * Control 1;; table VIIA and VIII * | International search | [Y]US5705569 (MOCZYGEMBA GEORGE A [US], et al); | [Y]US2005027071 (DEETER GARY A [US], et al) | by applicant | US5191024 | US4075285 | US5910546 | US5256736 |