EP2668828 - LED DRIVING CIRCUIT PACKAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.08.2019 [2019/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seoul Semiconductor Co., Ltd. 1-36 Block 727-5 Wonsi-dong Danwon-gu Gyeonggi-do, Ansan-si 425-851 / KR | [2013/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JONG, Young, Do 1-36 Block 727-5 Wonsi-dong Danwon-gu Gyeonggi-do Ansan-si 425-851 / KR | 02 /
KANG, Hyun, Gu 1-36 Block 727-5 Wonsi-dong Danwon-gu Gyeonggi-do Ansan-si 425-851 / KR | 03 /
JUNG, Hye, Man 1-36 Block 727-5 Wonsi-dong Danwon-gu Gyeonggi-do Ansan-si 425-851 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Kang, Nyung 1-36 Block 727-5 Wonsi-dong Danwon-gu Gyeonggi-do Ansan-si 425-851 / KR | [2013/49] | Representative(s) | Stolmár & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Blumenstraße 17 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/49] | Stolmár & Partner Blumenstraße 17 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12739718.0 | 27.01.2012 | WO2012IB00337 | Priority number, date | US201161437288P | 28.01.2011 Original published format: US 201161437288 P | US201161437296P | 28.01.2011 Original published format: US 201161437296 P | US201161437932P | 31.01.2011 Original published format: US 201161437932 P | US201161438304P | 01.02.2011 Original published format: US 201161438304 P | US201161438308P | 01.02.2011 Original published format: US 201161438308 P | US201161442732P | 14.02.2011 Original published format: US 201161442732 P | US201161467782P | 25.03.2011 Original published format: US 201161467782 P | US201161565574P | 01.12.2011 Original published format: US 201161565574 P | [2013/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012101522 | Date: | 02.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2668828 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.11.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H05B37/02, H05B33/08 | [2016/39] | CPC: |
H05B45/44 (EP,US);
H05B45/14 (EP);
H05B45/395 (EP,US);
H05B45/48 (US);
H01L2224/05554 (EP,KR,US);
H01L2224/32225 (EP,KR,US);
H01L2224/45139 (EP,KR,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,KR,US);
H01L2224/4813 (EP,KR,US);
H01L2224/48137 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48227 (EP,US);
H01L2224/49113 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00011 (EP);
H01L2924/181 (EP,KR,US);
H05B47/10 (EP,US);
Y02B20/30 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/45139, H01L2924/00 (US);
H01L2224/45139, H01L2924/00011 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00011, H01L2924/01049 (EP); |
Former IPC [2013/49] | H05B37/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/49] | Title | German: | LED-ANTRIEBSSCHALTUNGSPAKET | [2013/49] | English: | LED DRIVING CIRCUIT PACKAGE | [2013/49] | French: | BOÎTIER DE CIRCUIT DE COMMANDE DE DEL | [2013/49] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2013 | Search fee paid | 12.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/49] | 09.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/32] | 05.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.09.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2019 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009050907 (YUAN THOMAS [US], et al) [A] 1-16* the whole document *; | [A]US2010277094 (EMEK NECDET [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [XI]KR100997050B (TLI INC [KR]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [I] 4-16; | [L]US2011273103 (HONG SOON WON [KR]) [L] 1 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US7564198 (YAMAMOTO KENJI [JP], et al); | [X]US7795052 (LEE SEON GOO [KR], et al); | [A]US2010308739 (SHTEYNBERG ANATOLY [US], et al); | [A]KR20110007706 (CHIP & LIGHT CO LTD [KR]) |