EP2732306 - METHOD FOR COMPLETING AND CORRECTING DIGITAL WEATHER RADAR IMAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MeteoServe Wetterdienst GmbH Schnirchgasse 11 1030 Wien / AT | For all designated states Austro Control Österreichische Gesellschaft für Zivilluftfahr mit beschränkter Haftung Schnirchgasse 11 1030 Wien / AT | For all designated states Joanneum Research Forschungsgesellschaft mbH Leonhardstrasse 59 8010 Graz / AT | For all designated states AIT Austrian Institute of Technology GmbH Donau-City-Strasse 1 1220 Wien / AT | [2016/15] |
Former [2014/21] | For all designated states Meteoservice Wetterdienst GmbH Schnirchgasse 11 1030 Wien / AT | ||
For all designated states Austro Control Österreichische Gesellschaft für Zivilluftfahr mit Beschränkter Haftung Schnirchgasse 11 1030 Wien / AT | |||
For all designated states Joanneum Research Forschungsgesellschaft mbH Leonhardstrasse 59 8010 Graz / AT | |||
For all designated states AIT Austrian Institute of Technology GmbH Donau-City-Strasse 1 1220 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GANSTER, Harald St. Peter Hauptstraße 112 A-8042 Graz / AT | 02 /
MAYER, Heinz Am Josefgrund 29 A-8043 Graz / AT | 03 /
HENNERMANN, Karin Thaliastraße 66/5 A-1160 Wien / AT | 04 /
KERSCHBAUM, Markus Dingelstedtgasse 14/16 A-1150 Wien / AT | 05 /
CROONEN, Gerardus Sperrgasse 17/1/5 A-1150 Wien / AT | 06 /
NOWAK, Christoph Herzgasse 44/3 A-1100 Wien / AT | [2014/21] | Representative(s) | Wildhack & Jellinek Patentanwälte Patentanwälte Landstraßer Hauptstraße 50 1030 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2014/21] | Wildhack & Jellinek Patentanwälte Landstraßer Hauptstraße 50 1030 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 12740281.6 | 27.06.2012 | [2016/15] | WO2012AT50088 | Priority number, date | AT20110001050 | 15.07.2011 Original published format: AT 10502011 | [2014/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013010200 | Date: | 24.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2732306 | Date: | 21.05.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2732306 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/89, G01S13/95, G06T5/00, G06T5/50 | [2014/21] | CPC: |
G01S13/89 (EP);
G01S13/951 (AT);
G01S13/95 (EP);
G01W1/10 (AT);
G06T5/50 (EP);
G06T5/77 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERVOLLSTÄNDIGUNG UND BERICHTIGUNG VON DIGITALEN WETTERRADARBILDERN | [2014/21] | English: | METHOD FOR COMPLETING AND CORRECTING DIGITAL WEATHER RADAR IMAGES | [2014/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR COMPLÉTER ET CORRIGER LES IMAGES RADAR MÉTÉOROLOGIQUES NUMÉRIQUES | [2014/21] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/21] | 23.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.06.2012 | AL | 13.04.2016 | BG | 13.04.2016 | CY | 13.04.2016 | CZ | 13.04.2016 | DK | 13.04.2016 | EE | 13.04.2016 | ES | 13.04.2016 | FI | 13.04.2016 | HR | 13.04.2016 | IS | 13.04.2016 | IT | 13.04.2016 | LT | 13.04.2016 | LV | 13.04.2016 | MC | 13.04.2016 | MK | 13.04.2016 | MT | 13.04.2016 | NL | 13.04.2016 | PL | 13.04.2016 | RO | 13.04.2016 | RS | 13.04.2016 | SE | 13.04.2016 | SI | 13.04.2016 | SK | 13.04.2016 | SM | 13.04.2016 | TR | 13.04.2016 | IE | 27.06.2016 | LU | 27.06.2016 | BE | 30.06.2016 | NO | 13.07.2016 | GR | 14.07.2016 | PT | 16.08.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 27.06.2012 | |
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
MK | 13.04.2016 | ||
MT | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
TR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IE | 27.06.2016 | ||
LU | 27.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 27.06.2012 | |
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
MK | 13.04.2016 | ||
MT | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
IE | 27.06.2016 | ||
LU | 27.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 27.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
MK | 13.04.2016 | ||
MT | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
IE | 27.06.2016 | ||
LU | 27.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
MK | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
IE | 27.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 13.04.2016 | |
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
IE | 27.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | CZ | 13.04.2016 | |
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 13.04.2016 | |
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 13.04.2016 | |
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 13.04.2016 | |
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | ES | 13.04.2016 | |
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 13.04.2016 | |
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 13.04.2016 | |
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 13.04.2016 | |
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 13.04.2016 | |
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 13.04.2016 | |
NO | 13.07.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5828332 (FREDERICK PHILIP R [US]) [A] 1 * figures 5a,5b * * abstract * * column 7, line 53 - line 55 * * claim 24 *; | [A]US7427943 (KRONFELD KEVIN M [US], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]US2009066563 (HANNESEN RONALD [DE], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * |