EP2872954 - A METHOD FOR PROGRAMMING AN INDUSTRIAL ROBOT IN A VIRTUAL ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [2017/15] |
Former [2015/21] | For all designated states ABB Technology Ltd. Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANGE, Fredrik bergaliden 13 S-172 77 Sandbyberg / SE | [2015/21] | Representative(s) | Savela, Reino Aleksi ABB AB Intellectual Property Forskargränd 7 721 78 Västerås / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/21] | Savela, Reino Aleksi ABB AB Intellectual Property Ingenjör Bååths Gata 11 721 83 Västerås / SE | Application number, filing date | 12740532.2 | 13.07.2012 | WO2012EP63823 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014008949 | Date: | 16.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2872954 | Date: | 20.05.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/4097, B25J9/16, B23Q17/22 | [2015/21] | CPC: |
B25J9/1697 (EP,US);
G05B19/4097 (CN);
B25J9/163 (US);
B25J9/1671 (EP,US);
G06F30/00 (US);
G05B2219/37205 (EP,CN,US);
G05B2219/37555 (EP,CN,US);
G05B2219/37572 (CN);
G05B2219/40383 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/21] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR PROGRAMMIERUNG EINES INDUSTRIEROBOTERS IN EINER VIRTUELLEN UMGEBUNG | [2015/21] | English: | A METHOD FOR PROGRAMMING AN INDUSTRIAL ROBOT IN A VIRTUAL ENVIRONMENT | [2015/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PROGRAMMATION D'UN ROBOT INDUSTRIEL DANS UN ENVIRONNEMENT VIRTUEL | [2015/21] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/21] | 04.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/49] | 28.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.12.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]US6246468 (DIMSDALE JERRY [US]) [AD] 1-9* the whole document *; | [XA]WO2007046763 (MORPHIC TECHNOLOGIES AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [A] 4-9; | [X]EP1876503 (FANUC LTD [JP]) [X] 1-9 * columns 5, 6, 20 - columns 36, 37; figures 6, 7, 16 *; | [X]EP2082850 (FANUC LTD [JP]) [X] 1-9 * paragraphs [0009] - [0012] * | by applicant | US6246468 |