|
20.04.2017 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2016 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2016 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.05.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2016 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2016 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.05.2016 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.05.2016 |
|
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
29.09.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.09.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.09.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.09.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.09.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.09.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.09.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.08.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.08.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.07.2015 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2015 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.01.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.01.2015 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.01.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.01.2015 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
07.11.2014 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.07.2014 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
11 |
|
30.07.2014 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
30.07.2014 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
30.07.2014 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
30.07.2014 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
30.07.2014 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
21.01.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
21.01.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
07.01.2014 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2014 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.01.2014 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
29.06.2013 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/404 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
21.06.2013 |
Invitation to correct defects in demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
19.06.2013 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
19.06.2013 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
11.06.2013 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
11.06.2013 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
11.06.2013 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
11.06.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.11.2012 |
Notification relating to declaration under Rule 4.17 PCT (copy for ISA/EP) |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
02.11.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
02.11.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
02.11.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
03.08.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
03.08.2012 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
03.08.2012 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |
|
03.08.2012 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
20 |
|
03.08.2012 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
9 |
|
03.08.2012 |
Priority document (RO-procedure) |
PCT receiving Office |
13 |