Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2868169 | Global Dossier | 15.06.2016 | B1 | EP2868169 | 06.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261665012 | 27.06.2012 | WO2012EP65298 | 03.08.2012 | EP12741369 | 03.08.2012 | EP12173967 | 27.06.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014000828 | Global Dossier | 03.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261665012 | 27.06.2012 | EP12173967 | 27.06.2012 |