EP2671629 - MEMBRANE-FORMING DOPE FOR CARBON MEMBRANES AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING CARBON HOLLOW FIBER MEMBRANE USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.10.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOK Corporation 12-15, Shiba-Daimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8585 / JP | [2013/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IKAWA Yusuke c/o NOK Corporation 2000, Akatsuchi Kikugawa-shi Shizuoka 437-1507 / JP | 02 /
KODA, Yutaka c/o NOK Corporation 2000, Akatsuchi Kikugawa-shi Shizuoka 437-1507 / JP | 03 /
YAMAMOTO, Hirokazu c/o NOK Corporation 2000, Akatsuchi Kikugawa-shi Shizuoka 437- 1507 / JP | [2013/50] | Representative(s) | Adam, Holger, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [2014/38] |
Former [2013/50] | Albrecht, Thomas Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12742623.7 | 20.01.2012 | WO2012JP51197 | Priority number, date | JP20110020520 | 02.02.2011 Original published format: JP 2011020520 | [2013/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012105335 | Date: | 09.08.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2671629 | Date: | 11.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B01D71/02, B01D69/08 | [2013/50] | CPC: |
B01D69/087 (EP,KR,US);
B01D67/0067 (KR);
B01D69/0871 (KR);
B01D71/021 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2323/12 (KR);
B01D2323/219 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/50] | Title | German: | MEMBRANBILDENDE DOTIERUNG FÜR KOHLENSTOFFMEMBRANEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON KOHLENSTOFFHOHLFASERMEMBRANEN DAMIT | [2013/50] | English: | MEMBRANE-FORMING DOPE FOR CARBON MEMBRANES AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING CARBON HOLLOW FIBER MEMBRANE USING SAME | [2013/50] | French: | SOLUTION À FILER FORMANT UNE MEMBRANE POUR MEMBRANES DE CARBONE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRODUCTION DE MEMBRANE DE CARBONE SOUS FORME DE FIBRE CREUSE L'UTILISANT | [2013/50] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2013 | Translation filed | 23.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2013 | Search fee paid | 23.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/50] | 24.10.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2009034614 (NAT INST OF ADV IND & TECHNOL); | [A]JP2010269229 (NAT INST OF ADVANCED IND SCIEN) | by applicant | JPH10216489 | JP2006231095 | JP2009034614 |