17.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
11.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
28.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
04.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] |
23.03.2018 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 25.04.2018 [2018/17] |
02.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
05.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] |
01.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
17.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] |
17.11.2017 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] |
10.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] |
03.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] |
27.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] |
20.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] |
13.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
06.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] |
29.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] |
22.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] |
15.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] |
08.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
01.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
09.12.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 11.01.2017 [2017/02] |
06.12.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
06.12.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
05.12.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
20.10.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.09.2016 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
17.08.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.06.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.03.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.12.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.08.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
03.06.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.04.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.04.2015 |
First examination report |
|
08.08.2014 |
Change - extension states |
published on 10.09.2014 [2014/37] |
04.07.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
07.06.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.03.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.04.2014 [2014/15] |
07.03.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.04.2014 [2014/15] |
22.01.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.01.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.12.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.12.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.08.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|