EP2739830 - VALVETRAIN OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE, AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE, AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING A CORRESPONDING VALVETRAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUDI AG Postfach 11 44 74148 Neckarsulm / DE | [2014/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZEIDLER, Rüdiger Sattlerstr. 7a 85049 Ingolstadt / DE | [2014/24] | Application number, filing date | 12743087.4 | 01.08.2012 | WO2012EP03265 | Priority number, date | DE201110109256 | 02.08.2011 Original published format: DE102011109256 | [2014/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013017270 | Date: | 07.02.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2739830 | Date: | 11.06.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2739830 | Date: | 27.05.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F01L1/04, F01L1/053, F01L13/00 | [2015/08] | CPC: |
F01L1/04 (EP,US);
F01L1/053 (EP,US);
F01L13/0036 (EP,US);
F01L13/0042 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49293 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/24] | F01L1/053, F01L13/00, B23P15/00, F16H53/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VENTILTRIEB EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE, BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ENTSPRECHENDEN VENTILTRIEBS | [2014/24] | English: | VALVETRAIN OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE, AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE, AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING A CORRESPONDING VALVETRAIN | [2014/24] | French: | COMMANDE DE SOUPAPE D'UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE, MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE COMMANDE DE SOUPAPE CORRESPONDANTE | [2014/24] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/24] | 25.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.08.2012 | AL | 27.05.2015 | CY | 27.05.2015 | CZ | 27.05.2015 | DK | 27.05.2015 | EE | 27.05.2015 | ES | 27.05.2015 | FI | 27.05.2015 | HR | 27.05.2015 | IT | 27.05.2015 | LT | 27.05.2015 | LV | 27.05.2015 | MC | 27.05.2015 | MK | 27.05.2015 | MT | 27.05.2015 | NL | 27.05.2015 | PL | 27.05.2015 | RO | 27.05.2015 | RS | 27.05.2015 | SE | 27.05.2015 | SI | 27.05.2015 | SK | 27.05.2015 | SM | 27.05.2015 | TR | 27.05.2015 | IE | 01.08.2015 | LU | 01.08.2015 | BG | 27.08.2015 | NO | 27.08.2015 | GR | 28.08.2015 | BE | 31.08.2015 | CH | 31.08.2015 | LI | 31.08.2015 | IS | 27.09.2015 | PT | 28.09.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 01.08.2012 | |
CY | 27.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
MK | 27.05.2015 | ||
MT | 27.05.2015 | ||
NL | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
SE | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
SM | 27.05.2015 | ||
TR | 27.05.2015 | ||
IE | 01.08.2015 | ||
LU | 01.08.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
BE | 31.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 01.08.2012 | |
CY | 27.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
MT | 27.05.2015 | ||
NL | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
SE | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
SM | 27.05.2015 | ||
IE | 01.08.2015 | ||
LU | 01.08.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
BE | 31.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | CZ | 27.05.2015 | |
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
MT | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
IE | 01.08.2015 | ||
LU | 01.08.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | CZ | 27.05.2015 | |
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
IE | 01.08.2015 | ||
LU | 01.08.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 27.05.2015 | |
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
LU | 01.08.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 27.05.2015 | |
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
LU | 01.08.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | CZ | 27.05.2015 | |
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
LU | 01.08.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | CZ | 27.05.2015 | |
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
LU | 01.08.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/17] | CZ | 27.05.2015 | |
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
LU | 01.08.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 27.05.2015 | |
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | DK | 27.05.2015 | |
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | DK | 27.05.2015 | |
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 27.05.2015 | |
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 27.05.2015 | |
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE102010004591 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2006012959 (INA SCHAEFFLER KG [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102004002301 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102009048621 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE102009022657 |