EP2732609 - DYNAMIC SUBSUMPTION INFERENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2014/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUHN, Lukas, D. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 02 /
TADURI, Siddharth, S. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 03 /
NARAYANAN, Vidya 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 04 /
SHIH, Fuming 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2014/21] | Representative(s) | Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/21] | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12743283.9 | 13.07.2012 | WO2012US46762 | Priority number, date | US201161507934P | 14.07.2011 Original published format: US 201161507934 P | US201213547902 | 12.07.2012 Original published format: US201213547902 | [2014/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013010122 | Date: | 17.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2732609 | Date: | 21.05.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/725, H04W4/02 | [2014/21] | CPC: |
H04W4/025 (EP,KR,US);
H04M1/72454 (EP,US);
H04W4/21 (EP,KR,US);
H04W4/80 (EP,KR,US);
H04M1/72451 (EP,US);
H04M1/72457 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/21] | Extension states | BA | 10.02.2014 | ME | 10.02.2014 | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHEN EINORDNUNGSINFERENZ | [2014/21] | English: | DYNAMIC SUBSUMPTION INFERENCE | [2014/21] | French: | INFÉRENCE DE SUBSOMPTION DYNAMIQUE | [2014/21] | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/21] | 03.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/46] | 20.02.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.06.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.11.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2020 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1379064 (AVAYA TECHNOLOGY CORP [US]) [A] 1-40 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0013] - [0024] * * figures 1-8 *; | [XYI]US2004259536 (KESKAR DHANANJAY V [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,8-12,16,18-22,26,28-32,36,38-40 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] - [0018] * * pages 1,2 * [Y] 3,7,13,17,23,27,33,37 [I] 4,5,14,15,24,25,34,35; | [A]US2007239813 (PINDER ELLIS A [US], et al) [A] 1-40 * abstract * * paragraphs [0014] - [0021] ** figures 1-3 *; | [YA]US2009079547 (OKSANEN MARKKU [FI], et al) [Y] 3,13,23,33 * abstract * * paragraphs [0024] , [0025] , [0028] , [0029] , [0042] , [0046] - [0048] - [0053] , [0055] - [0058] * * figures 1-4 * [A] 1,2,4-12,14-22,24-32,34-40; | [A]US2009224867 (O'SHAUGHNESSY KEVIN MICHAEL [IE], et al) [A] 1-40 * abstract * * paragraphs [0035] - [0145] * * figures 1-10 *; | [YA]EP2302886 (INTEL CORP INTEL [US]) [Y] 7,17,27,37 * abstract * * paragraphs [0021] - [0027] - [0029] - [0031] * * figures 1-5 * [A] 1-6,8-16,18-26,28-36,38-40 | Examination | US2006167647 | US2008143518 | US2010293543 |