|
19.09.2018 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2017 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2017 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.10.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.10.2017 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.10.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.10.2017 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.10.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
19.09.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.08.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.04.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.04.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.04.2015 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.2014 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.09.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.09.2014 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.2014 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2014 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2014 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.03.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.01.2014 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.01.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
29.11.2013 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.09.2013 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.09.2013 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.09.2013 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
19.09.2013 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
19.09.2013 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
19.09.2013 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
19.09.2013 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.09.2013 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.06.2013 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.06.2013 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
26.06.2013 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
09.04.2013 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2013 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
11.03.2013 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.02.2013 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.02.2013 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.02.2013 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
26.02.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.02.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
24.01.2013 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.01.2013 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
15.10.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
15.10.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
15.10.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
30.07.2012 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
30.07.2012 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
30.07.2012 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
13 |
|
30.07.2012 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
30.07.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |