EP2737120 - METHODS FOR TUFTING A CARPET PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.10.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.11.2016 [2016/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Interface, Inc. 2859 Paces Ferry Road Suite 2000 Atlanta, Georgia 30339 / US | [2014/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MACHELL-ARCHER, Carson, Rebecca 2859 Paces Ferry Road Suite 2000 Atlanta, Georgia 30339 / US | 02 /
CHAPMAN, Charles, Chris 12018 Veterans Memorial Parkway Lafayette, Alabama 36862 / US | [2014/23] | Representative(s) | Phillips & Leigh LLP Temple Chambers 3-7 Temple Avenue London EC4Y 0DA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/23] | Phillips & Leigh 5 Pemberton Row London EC4A 3BA / GB | Application number, filing date | 12743603.8 | 24.07.2012 | WO2012US47926 | Priority number, date | US201113190635 | 26.07.2011 Original published format: US201113190635 | [2014/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013016314 | Date: | 31.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2737120 | Date: | 04.06.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | D05C15/32, D05C15/34 | [2014/23] | CPC: |
D05C15/32 (EP,US);
D05C15/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM TUFTEN VON FLORGEWEBE | [2016/03] | English: | METHODS FOR TUFTING A CARPET PRODUCT | [2014/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TOUFFETAGE D'UNE MOQUETTE | [2016/03] |
Former [2014/23] | VERFAHREN ZUM TUFTEN EINES TEPPICHPRODUKTS | ||
Former [2014/23] | PROCÉDÉS DE TOUFFETAGE DE TAPIS | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/23] | 28.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/45] | 23.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.02.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]US2009205547 (HALL WILTON [US], et al) [AD] 1-16 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0039]; figures 1-7 *; | [A]WO2010144902 (INTERFACE INC [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0031]; figures 1-6 *; | [A]GB2392172 (TUFTCO CORP [US]) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0046]; figures 1-11 *; | [A]US5383415 (PADGETT III WILLIAM P [US]) [A] 1-16 * column 3, line 64 - column 7, line 56; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US5094178 (WATKINS CHARLES W [US]) [A] 1-16 * column 3, line 19 - column 8, line 48; figures 1-10 *; | [A]GB2319786 (TUFTCO CORP [US]) [A] 1-16 * page 9, paragraph 3 - page 34, paragraph 1; figures 1-14 * | Examination | US2009260554 | by applicant | US2009205547 |