06.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] |
19.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
29.03.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] |
11.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.2023 [2023/37] |
14.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
16.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] |
12.05.2023 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 14.06.2023 [2023/24] |
05.05.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] |
28.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] |
21.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.05.2023 [2023/21] |
14.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.05.2023 [2023/20] |
17.02.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.03.2023 [2023/12] |
10.02.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.03.2023 [2023/11] |
03.02.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] |
27.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] |
20.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.02.2023 [2023/08] |
06.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.02.2023 [2023/06] |
03.06.2022 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
27.05.2022 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
27.05.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
27.05.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
25.01.2022 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.01.2022 |
Change - extension states |
published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
19.11.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.12.2021 [2021/51] |
19.11.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.12.2021 [2021/51] |
19.11.2021 |
Change - German title |
published on 22.12.2021 [2021/51] |
19.11.2021 |
Change - French title |
published on 22.12.2021 [2021/51] |
15.11.2021 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
26.07.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.06.2021 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
09.04.2021 |
Change - applicant |
published on 12.05.2021 [2021/19] |
30.11.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.10.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
16.09.2020 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.07.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.05.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.01.2020 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
08.01.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.01.2020 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
07.01.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
24.10.2019 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
29.07.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.05.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.02.2019 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
04.02.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
04.02.2019 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
02.02.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
26.11.2018 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
31.07.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.07.2018 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.05.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.01.2018 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
03.01.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
03.01.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
03.01.2018 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
13.11.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
22.10.2017 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
27.07.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.07.2017 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.03.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.03.2017 |
First examination report |
|
11.11.2016 |
Change - applicant |
published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] |
26.07.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.08.2015 |
New entry: Request for decision: result |
|
27.07.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.01.2015 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
06.12.2014 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
06.12.2014 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
21.11.2014 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
21.11.2014 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
20.11.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
25.08.2014 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
01.08.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] |
01.08.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] |
26.07.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.07.2014 |
New entry: Request for decision: receipt of request |
|
07.03.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.01.2014 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
04.01.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.12.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.11.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.12.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.11.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.09.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.08.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|