Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9774795 | Global Dossier | 26.09.2017 | B2 | US2014091218 | 03.04.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201108353 | 18.05.2011 | WO2012GB51706 | 18.07.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2772047 | Global Dossier | 06.07.2022 | B1 | EP2772047 | 03.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201108353 | 18.05.2011 | WO2012GB51706 | 18.07.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2927824T | 11.11.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB201108353 | 18.05.2011 | WO2012GB51706 | 18.07.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012156762 | Global Dossier | 22.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201108353 | 18.05.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2490929 | 24.01.2018 | B | GB2490929 | 21.11.2012 | A | GB201108353D0 | 29.06.2011 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB201108353 | 18.05.2011 |