EP2772047 - INFRARED DETECTOR SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.01.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leonardo UK Ltd 1 Eagle Place St. James's London SW1Y 6AF / GB | [2021/19] |
Former [2016/50] | For all designated states LEONARDO MW LTD Christopher Martin Road Basildon, Essex SS14 3EL / GB | ||
Former [2014/36] | For all designated states SELEX ES LTD Christopher Martin Road Basildon, Essex SS14 3EL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THORNE, Peter c/o Selex Galileo Limited Christopher Martin Road Basildon Essex SS14 3EL / GB | 02 /
KNOWLES, Peter c/o Selex Galileo Limited Christopher Martin Road Basildon Essex SS14 3EL / GB | [2014/36] | Representative(s) | Tolfree, Adam Joseph Benjamin Impetus IP Ltd Office One Ridgecombe Barn Lifton, Devon PL16 0HD / GB | [2022/27] |
Former [2014/36] | Wojcik, Lucy Eleanor c/o Impetus IP Limited Suite 31 West Devon Business Park Brook Lane Tavistock, PL19 9DP / GB | Application number, filing date | 12743761.4 | 18.07.2012 | [2022/27] | WO2012GB51706 | Priority number, date | GB20110008353 | 18.05.2011 Original published format: GB 201108353 | [2014/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012156762 | Date: | 22.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2772047 | Date: | 03.09.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2772047 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/345 | [2021/51] | CPC: |
H04N25/68 (EP,GB,US);
H04N5/33 (US);
H04N23/20 (EP,GB);
H04N25/44 (GB);
H04N25/445 (EP,US);
H04N25/60 (US);
H04N25/67 (US);
H04N25/671 (US);
H04N25/77 (US);
H04N25/00 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/36] | H04N5/367, H04N5/33 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFRAROT BILDAUFNEHMER UND BILDAUFNAHMEVERFAHREN | [2021/51] | English: | INFRARED DETECTOR SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2014/36] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTEUR À INFRAROUGES | [2021/51] |
Former [2014/36] | INFRAROTDETEKTORSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2014/36] | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION PAR INFRAROUGES | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/36] | 31.01.2014 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 0001 | 09.04.2014 | Request for decision received: Priority | 05.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2015 | Result of request for decision (Priority): Request accepted | 14.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 06.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 02.12.2021 | 02.12.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 26.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.05.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/24] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 06.01.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 06.01.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.01.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 31.01.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 31.01.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.02.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.12.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 21.12.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.01.2018 | Decision despatched | 05.11.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 05.11.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.12.2014 | Decision despatched | 05.11.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 05.11.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.12.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.07.2012 | AL | 06.07.2022 | AT | 06.07.2022 | BG | 06.07.2022 | CY | 06.07.2022 | CZ | 06.07.2022 | DK | 06.07.2022 | EE | 06.07.2022 | FI | 06.07.2022 | HR | 06.07.2022 | LT | 06.07.2022 | LV | 06.07.2022 | MC | 06.07.2022 | MK | 06.07.2022 | MT | 06.07.2022 | NL | 06.07.2022 | PL | 06.07.2022 | RO | 06.07.2022 | RS | 06.07.2022 | SI | 06.07.2022 | SK | 06.07.2022 | SM | 06.07.2022 | IE | 18.07.2022 | LU | 18.07.2022 | CH | 31.07.2022 | LI | 31.07.2022 | NO | 06.10.2022 | GR | 07.10.2022 | IS | 06.11.2022 | PT | 07.11.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/34] | HU | 18.07.2012 | |
AL | 06.07.2022 | ||
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
CY | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
MK | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
IE | 18.07.2022 | ||
LU | 18.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 18.07.2012 | |
AL | 06.07.2022 | ||
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CY | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
MK | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
IE | 18.07.2022 | ||
LU | 18.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 18.07.2012 | |
AL | 06.07.2022 | ||
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CY | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
IE | 18.07.2022 | ||
LU | 18.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 18.07.2012 | |
AL | 06.07.2022 | ||
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
IE | 18.07.2022 | ||
LU | 18.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
IE | 18.07.2022 | ||
LU | 18.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
IE | 18.07.2022 | ||
LU | 18.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
LU | 18.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 06.07.2022 | |
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
LU | 18.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 06.07.2022 | |
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
LU | 18.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 06.07.2022 | |
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
LU | 18.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 06.07.2022 | |
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 06.07.2022 | |
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | FI | 06.07.2022 | |
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 06.07.2022 | |
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 06.07.2022 | |
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 06.07.2022 | |
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | NL | 06.07.2022 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2006083095 (KIM NEIL Y [US], et al); | [Y]WO2007036055 (UNIV FRASER SIMON [CA], et al); | [A]EP2172973 (BOLY MEDIA COMM SHENZHEN CO LT [CN]) | Examination | JPH09284656 |