01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
09.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
12.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.07.2020 [2020/29] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
21.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] |
14.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
07.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
24.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
20.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.01.2020 [2020/04] |
22.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
15.11.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
08.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] |
01.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
25.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
18.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
11.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
23.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.09.2019 [2019/39] |
16.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] |
09.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
26.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2019 [2019/35] |
19.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] |
12.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2019 [2019/33] |
21.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] |
07.12.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 09.01.2019 [2019/02] |
02.11.2018 |
New entry: Information about intention to grant a patent |
|
02.11.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
26.10.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 28.11.2018 [2018/48] |
22.10.2018 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
22.10.2018 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
22.10.2018 |
Deletion: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
19.10.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
19.10.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
15.06.2018 |
Change - applicant |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
07.06.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
25.05.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] |
25.05.2018 |
Change - German title |
published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] |
18.05.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] |
27.02.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.02.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
04.11.2017 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] |
27.10.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] |
27.10.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] |
21.02.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.02.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.02.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.04.2014 |
Change - extension states |
published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] |
25.02.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.11.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] |
15.11.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] |
10.09.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.08.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.08.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
14.08.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.12.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.08.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.08.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|