EP2674271 - PRODUCTION METHOD FOR POWDER COMPACT, AND POWDER COMPACT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.11.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56, Suda-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | [2013/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRAIWA Toshiki c/o NGK INSULATORS LTD. 2-56 Suda-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8530 / JP | 02 /
NAKAGAWA Hidemi c/o NGK INSULATORS LTD. 2-56 Suda-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8530 / JP | 03 /
KIMURA Takuji c/o NGK INSULATORS LTD. 2-56 Suda-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8530 / JP | [2013/51] | Representative(s) | Naylor, Matthew John Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Naylor, Matthew John Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 12744284.6 | 11.01.2012 | WO2012JP50366 | Priority number, date | JP20110026720 | 10.02.2011 Original published format: JP 2011026720 | [2013/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012108222 | Date: | 16.08.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2674271 | Date: | 18.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B28B1/00 | [2013/51] | CPC: |
C04B35/63456 (EP,US);
C04B35/486 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES PULVERPRESSKÖRPERS UND PULVERPRESSKÖRPER | [2013/51] | English: | PRODUCTION METHOD FOR POWDER COMPACT, AND POWDER COMPACT | [2013/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION POUR COMPRIMÉS DE POUDRE, ET COMPRIMÉS DE POUDRE | [2013/51] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2013 | Translation filed | 31.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2013 | Search fee paid | 31.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/51] | 06.11.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2010245505 (NGK INSULATORS LTD); | [X]JP2010030299 (NGK INSULATORS LTD) | by applicant | JPH08238613 | JPH1148222 | JPH11302302 | JP2001335371 | JP2010241129 | WO2009104703 |