Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US9444495 | ![]() | 13.09.2016 | B2 | |
US2015309959 | 29.10.2015 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201113303048 | 22.11.2011 | |||
US201514635960 | 02.03.2015 | |||
US201161457233 | 08.02.2011 | |||
US201414247162 | 07.04.2014 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US9552175 | ![]() | 24.01.2017 | B2 | |
US2014237205 | 21.08.2014 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201113303048 | 22.11.2011 | |||
US201161457233 | 08.02.2011 | |||
US201414265280 | 29.04.2014 | |||
US201414247162 | 07.04.2014 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US9575908 | ![]() | 21.02.2017 | B2 | |
US2014237176 | 21.08.2014 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201113303048 | 22.11.2011 | |||
US201414265241 | 29.04.2014 | |||
US201161457233 | 08.02.2011 | |||
US201414247162 | 07.04.2014 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US9779020 | ![]() | 03.10.2017 | B2 | |
US2014237157 | 21.08.2014 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201113303048 | 22.11.2011 | |||
US201161457233 | 08.02.2011 | |||
US201414265270 | 29.04.2014 | |||
US201414247162 | 07.04.2014 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US8972805 | ![]() | 03.03.2015 | B2 | |
US2014223262 | 07.08.2014 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201113303048 | 22.11.2011 | |||
US201161457233 | 08.02.2011 | |||
US201414247162 | 07.04.2014 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US11789662 | ![]() | 17.10.2023 | B2 | |
US2022405018 | 22.12.2022 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US202217853741 | 29.06.2022 | |||
US201816236946 | 31.12.2018 | |||
US202117194083 | 05.03.2021 | |||
US202016937713 | 24.07.2020 | |||
US201113303048 | 22.11.2011 | |||
US201514635960 | 02.03.2015 | |||
US201161457233 | 08.02.2011 | |||
US201414247162 | 07.04.2014 | |||
US201615262462 | 12.09.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US11422749 | ![]() | 23.08.2022 | B2 | |
US2021318835 | 14.10.2021 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201816236946 | 31.12.2018 | |||
US202117194083 | 05.03.2021 | |||
US202016937713 | 24.07.2020 | |||
US201113303048 | 22.11.2011 | |||
US201514635960 | 02.03.2015 | |||
US201161457233 | 08.02.2011 | |||
US201414247162 | 07.04.2014 | |||
US201615262462 | 12.09.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US10942682 | ![]() | 09.03.2021 | B2 | |
US2021011661 | 14.01.2021 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201816236946 | 31.12.2018 | |||
US202016937713 | 24.07.2020 | |||
US201113303048 | 22.11.2011 | |||
US201514635960 | 02.03.2015 | |||
US201161457233 | 08.02.2011 | |||
US201414247162 | 07.04.2014 | |||
US201615262462 | 12.09.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US10725704 | ![]() | 28.07.2020 | B2 | |
US2019212948 | 11.07.2019 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201816236946 | 31.12.2018 | |||
US201113303048 | 22.11.2011 | |||
US201514635960 | 02.03.2015 | |||
US201161457233 | 08.02.2011 | |||
US201414247162 | 07.04.2014 | |||
US201615262462 | 12.09.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US10168954 | ![]() | 01.01.2019 | B2 | |
US2016378404 | 29.12.2016 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201113303048 | 22.11.2011 | |||
US201514635960 | 02.03.2015 | |||
US201161457233 | 08.02.2011 | |||
US201414247162 | 07.04.2014 | |||
US201615262462 | 12.09.2016 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
KR102126643B | ![]() | 25.06.2020 | B1 | |
KR20190089172 | 30.07.2019 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
WO2012CA00110 | 08.02.2012 | |||
US201113303048 | 22.11.2011 | |||
US201161457233 | 08.02.2011 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
KR101989775B | ![]() | 17.06.2019 | B1 | |
KR20140061304 | 21.05.2014 | A | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
WO2012CA00110 | 08.02.2012 | |||
US201113303048 | 22.11.2011 | |||
US201161457233 | 08.02.2011 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
JP2014506698 | ![]() | 17.03.2014 | A | |
Priority number | Date | |||
WO2012CA00110 | 08.02.2012 | |||
US201113303048 | 22.11.2011 | |||
US201161457233 | 08.02.2011 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
EP2673713 | ![]() | 27.01.2021 | B1 | |
EP2673713 | 01.06.2016 | A4 | ||
EP2673713 | 18.12.2013 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
WO2012CA00110 | 08.02.2012 | |||
US201113303048 | 22.11.2011 | |||
US201161457233 | 08.02.2011 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
WO2012106806 | ![]() | 11.10.2012 | A8 | |
WO2012106806 | 16.08.2012 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201113303048 | 22.11.2011 | |||
US201161457233 | 08.02.2011 | |||
Type | ![]() | |||
Publication No. | Date | Type | ||
US8713379 | ![]() | 29.04.2014 | B2 | |
US2012204079 | 09.08.2012 | A1 | ||
Priority number | Date | |||
US201113303048 | 22.11.2011 | |||
US201161457233 | 08.02.2011 |