EP2673346 - A SOLID LUBRICANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unique Technologies Associates 42 Mileed Way Avenel, NJ 07001 / US | [2013/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KVEREL, Eugene 325 Fifth Avenue Apartment 36D New York, NY 10016 / US | [2013/51] | Representative(s) | Burö, Sven Peter, et al SKF B.V. Kelvinbaan 16 3439 MT Nieuwegein / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Burö, Sven Peter, et al Kelvinbaan 16 3439MT Nieuwegein / NL | Application number, filing date | 12744801.7 | 06.02.2012 | WO2012US23958 | Priority number, date | US201113023337 | 08.02.2011 Original published format: US201113023337 | [2013/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012109136 | Date: | 16.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2673346 | Date: | 18.12.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.08.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C10M103/02 | [2013/51] | CPC: |
C10M103/00 (EP,US);
C10M103/02 (EP,KR,US);
F16C19/22 (KR);
F16C33/66 (KR);
F16C33/6696 (EP,US);
C10M2201/041 (EP,US);
C10M2201/0413 (EP,US);
C10M2201/066 (EP,US);
C10M2213/0606 (EP,US);
C10N2020/06 (EP,US);
C10N2030/06 (EP,US);
C10N2030/08 (EP,US);
C10N2030/64 (EP,US);
C10N2040/02 (EP,US);
C10N2050/08 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/51] | Title | German: | FESTSCHMIERSTOFF | [2013/51] | English: | A SOLID LUBRICANT | [2013/51] | French: | LUBRIFIANT SOLIDE | [2013/51] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2013 | Search fee paid | 09.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/51] | 12.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/34] | 25.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5363821 (RAO V DURGA N [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-13 * column 1, lines 7-12; claims 4-5,14 * [I] 1-13; | [XI]WO2008069936 (HENKEL CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5-13 * paragraphs [0038] , [0045] - [0046] - [0075] - [0077] - [0079] * [I] 1-13; | [X]US2008312111 (MALSHE AJAY P [US], et al) [X] 1-8* examples 5,7-9,12-13; claim 77 * | International search | [Y]US3199934 (WYK JAN W VAN); | [Y]US3787320 (HAMPEL B, et al); | [A]US4560291 (BONENGEL ROLAND [DE], et al); | [A]US5190696 (FUJII MASAKI [JP], et al); | [Y]US5277126 (WENDT BERNARD J [US], et al); | [A]US5393440 (ROLLER KENT G [US], et al); | [Y]US2003144155 (TENNE RESHEF [IL], et al); | [Y]JP2008007380 (TOKAI CARBON KK); | [A]US2008234149 (MALSHE AJAY P [US], et al) |