Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
08.01.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] |
07.07.2015 | Change - representative | |
03.03.2015 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
11.04.2014 | Change - extension states | published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] |
29.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant | |
05.03.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
15.11.2013 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] |
15.11.2013 | Request for examination filed | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] |
08.10.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
20.09.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
20.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant | |
04.09.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
02.08.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
28.08.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
17.08.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication |