Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2012274583 | Global Dossier | 01.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161440591 | 08.02.2011 | US201213369137 | 08.02.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20140024854 | Global Dossier | 03.03.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161440591 | 08.02.2011 | WO2012US24350 | 08.02.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2014507726 | Global Dossier | 27.03.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161440591 | 08.02.2011 | WO2012US24350 | 08.02.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103534674 | Global Dossier | 22.01.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161440591 | 08.02.2011 | WO2012US24350 | 08.02.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2012214445 | Global Dossier | 01.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161440591 | 08.02.2011 | WO2012US24350 | 08.02.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2673698 | Global Dossier | 18.12.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161440591 | 08.02.2011 | WO2012US24350 | 08.02.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2826390 | 16.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161440591 | 08.02.2011 | WO2012US24350 | 08.02.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012109368 | Global Dossier | 16.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161440591 | 08.02.2011 |