Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013317167 | Global Dossier | 28.11.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012JP52940 | 09.02.2012 | JP2011027925 | 10.02.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20140009337 | Global Dossier | 22.01.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012JP52940 | 09.02.2012 | JP2011027925 | 10.02.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5870938B | Global Dossier | 01.03.2016 | B2 | JPWO2012108491 | 03.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2012556923 | 09.02.2012 | WO2012JP52940 | 09.02.2012 | JP2011027925 | 10.02.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103347922 | Global Dossier | 09.10.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012JP52940 | 09.02.2012 | JP2011027925 | 10.02.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2674444 | Global Dossier | 25.06.2014 | A4 | EP2674444 | 18.12.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012JP52940 | 09.02.2012 | JP2011027925 | 10.02.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012108491 | Global Dossier | 16.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2011027925 | 10.02.2011 |