EP2674444 - WATERBORNE POLYURETHANE RESIN DISPERSION AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UBE Industries, Ltd. 1978-96 Oaza Kogushi Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-8633 / JP | [2013/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORIKAMI, Atsushi c/o UBE INDUSTRIES, LTD. 1978-96, Oaza Kogushi Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-8633 / JP | 02 /
NAIKI, Masahiro c/o UBE INDUSTRIES, LTD. 1978-96, Oaza Kogushi Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-8633 / JP | 03 /
ADACHI, Fumio c/o UBE INDUSTRIES, LTD. 1978-96, Oaza Kogushi Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-8633 / JP | 04 /
TAKAHASHI, Manabu c/o UBE INDUSTRIES, LTD. 1978-96, Oaza Kogushi Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-8633 / JP | [2013/51] | Representative(s) | Beckmann, Claus, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [2014/41] |
Former [2014/38] | Adam, Holger, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/51] | Albrecht, Thomas Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12745273.8 | 09.02.2012 | WO2012JP52940 | Priority number, date | JP20110027925 | 10.02.2011 Original published format: JP 2011027925 | [2013/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012108491 | Date: | 16.08.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2674444 | Date: | 18.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.08.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/65, C08G18/80, C09D5/02, C09D175/04 | [2013/51] | CPC: |
C08G18/0823 (EP,US);
C08G18/65 (KR);
C09D175/04 (KR,US);
C08G18/10 (EP,US);
C08G18/6659 (EP,US);
C08G18/80 (KR);
C08J3/03 (KR);
C08L75/04 (KR);
C09D175/06 (EP,US);
C09D5/02 (KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/51] | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGE POLYURETHANHARZDISPERSION UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2013/51] | English: | WATERBORNE POLYURETHANE RESIN DISPERSION AND USE THEREOF | [2013/51] | French: | DISPERSION DE RÉSINE POLYURÉTHANE AQUEUSE ET SES APPLICATIONS | [2013/51] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2013 | Translation filed | 22.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2013 | Search fee paid | 22.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/51] | 27.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/06] | 14.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.03.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]WO2012002569 (KANSAI PAINT CO LTD [JP], et al) [AP] 1-7 * example D17; table 9 * | International search | [A]WO2010098316 (UBE INDUSTRIES [JP], et al); | [A]JPH06279562 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS); | [A]WO2009145242 (UBE INDUSTRIES [JP], et al); | [A]WO2010098317 (UBE INDUSTRIES [JP], et al); | [A]WO2010098318 (UBE INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) | by applicant | JPH10120757 | JP2002128851 | JP2000104015 | JP2005220255 | WO2010098316 | - The Comprehensive Materials and Technology for a Novel Polyurethane Production, CMC PUBLISHING CO., LTD., page 43 |